Sahagun v. Williams et al

Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E. Williams
Petitioner: Jahuart Sahagun
Case Number: 2:2014cv00539
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2015 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to 14 Motion to Dismiss. Response due by 4/27/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
September 5, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the clerk of the court shall file the petition for a writof habeas corpus. Respondents shall have 45 days from the date on which the petition was served to answer or otherwise respond to the petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/5/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: AG - SLR)
October 22, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Respondents' 7 Motion to Extend Time re 6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents shall have through 12/3/2014 to file and serve an answer or other response to the Petition. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahagun v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jahuart Sahagun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]