v. Wilson

Defendant: Dalton Wilson
Plaintiff: United States of America
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00166
Filed: April 1, 2009
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Torts to Land Office
County: Lander
Referring Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
Presiding Judge: Edward C. Reed
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331(a) Fed. Question: Real Property

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2010 106 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr., on 8/5/2010. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lander County's 100 "Emergency Motion to Withdraw and Stay Injunction and Judgment Pending Preparation of Motion to Reconsider and Intervene" is DENIED. No motion to reconsider and intervene, such as are proposed by Lander County, will be considered. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
September 15, 2010 116 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 9/15/2010. IT IS ORDERED that P's 111 motion is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
October 26, 2010 123 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 10/25/2010. ORDERED that D's # 117 Petition and # 118 Motion to stay are STRICKEN. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 18, 2010 129 Featured Case ORDER DENYING D's # 126 Motion to Stay Order Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 11/18/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 6, 2010 79 Featured Case ORDERED that Wilson's 60 Motion for stay is DENIED as moot. FUTHER ORD that P's 61 Motion for permanent injunction is GRANTED. An order imposing permanent injunction will be filed separately. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 5/5/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 6, 2010 80 Featured Case PERMANENT INJUNCTION. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendant Dalton Wilson, and any person in active concert or participation with him who receives actual notice of this order by personal service or otherwise, are hereby permanently enjoined and re strained as follows: (1) Wilson shall vacate the property located at North half at the Southwest quarter at section 12, Township 22 North, Range 47 East, Mount Diablo Meridian, Lander County, Nevada, also known as lots 3 and 4, hereinafter referr ed to as the "subject property"; (2) Wilson shall permanently remove from the subject property by July 31, 2010, all personal belongings and all personal property within his control or possession as evidenced by its presence on the subj ect property; (3) Any and all personal belongings or personal property owned by Wilson or within his control or possession that remains on the subject property after July 31, 2010, shall be deemed abandoned and may be disposed of by the Bureau o f Land Management or its designee as abandoned property; and(4) If Wilson does not voluntarily remove himself, his personal belongings and any personal property within his control or possession from the subject property by July 31, 2010, the United States shall remove same from the subject property and may seek an award of costs for such removal. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 5/5/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 14, 2010 93 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 7/14/2010. IT IS ORDERED that the 89 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
July 28, 2010 98 Featured Case ORDERED that our Order (# 88 ), requiring the filing of a pre-trial order, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that D's motions, styled as "petitions" (## 96 and 97 ) are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgm ent in favor of P and against D, in accordance with our Order (# 54 ), finding D liable for trespass, our Order (# 79 ), granting P's motion for permanent injunction, and the Permanent Injunction (# 80 ). Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 7/28/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: v. Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalton Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]