Paiute Pipeline Company v. Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership et al

Defendant: California Interstate Telephone Company, Century 21, Tahoe Pines Realty, Clover Valley Lumber Company, Continental Telephone Company of California, D/B/A Continental Telephone Company of Nevada, Douglas County Sewer Improvement District No. 1, Lisa Kristin Farmer, Mary Hansen, Harich Tahoe Developments, Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership, Lake Tahoe Land Company, Inc., Nancy Grace Khoury-Salameh and Roy K. Salameh, Trustee, Nancy Grace Khoury-Salameh, Trustee of the Salameh Family Trust Dated March 24, 2003, Nanuk Real Estate Consulting, Inc., Placerville Lumber Company, Sierra Pacific Power Company, Denise Sievers, Jack K. Sievers, Stewart Title of Nevada Holdings, Inc., Harich Tahoe, Tahoe Village Owners' Association, Tahoe Village, Inc. and The Ridge Tahoe Property Owners Association
775)588-1326 (fax: William Cole
702)382-1894 (fax: Paiute Pipeline Company
619)299-8463 (fax: Fred Totah
Case Number: 3:2010cv00661
Filed: October 21, 2010
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717 Natural Gas Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. THE COURT HEREBY GRANTS Paiute's 5 Motion to Confirm Its Authority to Condemn and Take Immediate Possession of the Parcels pursuant to the following terms: (1) Paiute may occupy Defendant Heavenly's property pursuan t to the terms of the Stipulation and Order for settlement executed between the parties; (2) Paiute may occupy Defendant Cole's property pursuant to the terms of the Stipulation and Order for occupancy executed between the parties; (3) Paiute ma y occupy Defendant Totah/Salameh's property, namely, a 20, 113 square foot easement for natural gas utility purposes on a portion of a 3.25 acre parcel, APN 1319-19-802-001, said right of occupancy to commence the day Plaintiff deposits with the Clerk of Court $8,400.00, which is the amount of Pauite's appraisal for the easement rights sought. The easement is more accurately described in Exhibit 1. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/14/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
May 2, 2011 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. In reference to Minute Order 115 , before the court is Defendant Heavenly Valley Limited Partnerships Motion to Release and Distribute Funds 105 . IT IS ORDERED that the deposited funds shall be immediately disbursed. The Clerk of the Cou rt shall prepare a check in the amount of fifteen thousand five hundred dollars ($15,500.00) made payable to Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership and shall mail said check to Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership, P.O. Box 2180, Stateline, Nevada 89449, Attention: Paul Pfotenhauer. IT IS SO ORDERED. (NOTE: Certified copy of Minute Order sent to Finance, Las Vegas.) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/2/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
June 21, 2011 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELEASING FUNDS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deposited funds shall be immediately disbursed. The Clerk shall prepare a check in the amount of eighty-four hundred dollars ($8,400.00) made payable to Jack and Denise Sievers and shall mai l said check to them in care of Michael K. Johnson, Rollston, Henderson, Crabb & Johnson, Ltd. Motions terminated: 117 MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Jack K. Sievers. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/20/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
December 28, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT OF CONDEMNATION REGARDING DOUGLAS COUNTY ASSESSOR PARCEL NUMBERS 1319-19-802-003, 1319-00-002-026, AND 1319-19-702-001 in favor of Paiute Pipeline Company against Clover Valley Lumber Company, Harich Tahoe Developments, Lake Tahoe Land Comp any, Inc., Placerville Lumber Company, Tahoe Village, Inc., Harich Tahoe. Those Defendants identified as Unknown Owners Pursuant to FRCP 71.1 were duly served with process by publication and have failed to appear in this matter, and Paiute has obtai ned entry of default against them. Judgment by Default is here entered against said Defendants, by which they take nothing in the above-entitled matter. (see order for further specifics) Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/27/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)
December 28, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINAL ORDER OF CONDEMNATION REGARDING DOUGLAS COUNTY ASSESSOR PARCEL NUMBERS 1319-19-802-003, 1319-00-002-026, AND 1319-19-702-001. IT IS ORDERED that there shall be condemned to the Paiute the rights, title and interest in the real property described herein this order. Paiute, its successors and assigns, for use by them and their employees and contractors, hereby acquire a perpetual right and easement, the terms of which are contained in Exhibits 2, 3, and 4, and incorporated herein. FURTHER ORDERED, that a copy of this Amended Final Order of Condemnation be recorded in the office of the County Recorder of Douglas County, Nevada, and thereupon title to the property rights hereinbefore described shall vest in Paiute. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/28/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO) Modified on 12/28/2011 to correct spelling error. (KO)
June 29, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT of Condemnation Regarding Douglas County Assessor Parcel Number 1319-19-802-006 re Stipulated/Consent Judgment 68 . Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/29/12. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 29, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER of Condemnation Regarding Douglas County Assessor Parcel Number 1319-19-802-006. (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/29/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paiute Pipeline Company v. Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Interstate Telephone Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century 21, Tahoe Pines Realty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clover Valley Lumber Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Telephone Company of California, D/B/A Continental Telephone Company of Nevada
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Sewer Improvement District No. 1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Kristin Farmer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hansen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harich Tahoe Developments
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heavenly Valley Limited Partnership
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Tahoe Land Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Grace Khoury-Salameh and Roy K. Salameh, Trustee, Nancy Grace Khoury-Salameh, Trustee of the Salameh Family Trust Dated March 24, 2003
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nanuk Real Estate Consulting, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Placerville Lumber Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Pacific Power Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Sievers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack K. Sievers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title of Nevada Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harich Tahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahoe Village Owners' Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tahoe Village, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ridge Tahoe Property Owners Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
775)588-1326 (fax: William Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702)382-1894 (fax: Paiute Pipeline Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
619)299-8463 (fax: Fred Totah
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]