Roeder et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al

Defendant: BP America, Inc. and Atlantic Richfield Company
Plaintiff: Lisa Lackore, Michael Lackore, Anna Roeder, Philip Roeder and Dayna Anglin
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00105
Filed: February 14, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Referring Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 104 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING Plaintiffs' 98 Motion to Supplement the Record. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 21, 2013 116 Featured Case JUDGMENT and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 22, 2013 117 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Reasonable Attorney Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 8, 2011 50 Featured Case ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss 28 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The challenged claims are dismissed, except the claims for strict liability and battery. Furthermore, although the separate claims for nuisance per se and negligence per se are dismissed as separate causes of action, Plaintiffs may still assert these theories under the nuisance and negligence claims, respectively, via dispositive motions in thefuture. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/30/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Roeder et al v. Atlantic Richfield Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D Cools
Represented By: William J Duffy
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Pilkington
Represented By: Jonathan W. Rauchway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Joshua D Cools
Represented By: William J Duffy
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Pilkington
Represented By: Jonathan W. Rauchway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Lackore
Represented By: Steven J German
Represented By: Howard A. Janet
Represented By: Robert K Jenner
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Kristen Martini
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Peterson
Represented By: David A. Pote
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Represented By: Joel Rubenstein
Represented By: Kenneth M. Suggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lackore
Represented By: Steven J German
Represented By: Howard A. Janet
Represented By: Robert K Jenner
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Kristen Martini
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Peterson
Represented By: David A. Pote
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Represented By: Joel Rubenstein
Represented By: Kenneth M. Suggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Roeder
Represented By: Steven J German
Represented By: Howard A. Janet
Represented By: Robert K Jenner
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Kristen Martini
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Peterson
Represented By: David A. Pote
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Represented By: Joel Rubenstein
Represented By: Kenneth M. Suggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Roeder
Represented By: Steven J German
Represented By: Howard A. Janet
Represented By: Robert K Jenner
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Kristen Martini
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Peterson
Represented By: David A. Pote
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Represented By: Joel Rubenstein
Represented By: Kenneth M. Suggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dayna Anglin
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Robert K Jenner
Represented By: Howard A. Janet
Represented By: Steven J German
Represented By: Kristen Martini
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Peterson
Represented By: David A. Pote
Represented By: Kent R. Robison
Represented By: Joel Rubenstein
Represented By: Kenneth M. Suggs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]