Knight v. Climbing Magazine et al

Defendant: Climbing Magazine, Mark Crowther , NY, SKRAM Media, LLC, Matt Samet , CO and Cedar Wright , CO
Plaintiff: Brian Knight
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00146
Filed: March 1, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Referring Judge: Robert A. McQuaid
 
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 4, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Ds' # 8 Brief concerning removal is GRANTED. Accordingly, the court shall accept Ds' removal of this action and exercise diversity jurisdiction over the complaint. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/3/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 14, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss.; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 09/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
November 8, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's 25 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Defendant Climbing Magazine is DISMISSED as a defendant in this action. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
November 8, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's 26 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED, plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days after entry of this order to effectuate service upon defendants in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/8/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
December 20, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that D's # 42 Motion to strike is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall STRIKE P's # 41 Notice to the court. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/19/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 31, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that D's # 46 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED. P's # 24 Amended complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. FURTHER ORDERED that P shall have 30 days to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 14, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Climbing Magazine is granted twenty (20) days to establish the minimum amount in controversy for federal jurisdiction. Plaintiff is granted ten (10) days to file an opposition. No reply is required. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/12/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
December 18, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Ds' # 56 Motion to dismiss is GRANTED in-part and DENIED in-part. ( see pdf order for specifics ) FURTHER ORD P's # 60 Motion to strike is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 12/18/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 7, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE in its entirety. Defendant's 64 Motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED. Plaintiff's fourth cause of action for appropriation of publicity is DISMISSED. Defendant's 73 Motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 06/06/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Knight v. Climbing Magazine et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Climbing Magazine
Represented By: Jodi Donetta Lowry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Crowther , NY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKRAM Media, LLC
Represented By: Jodi Donetta Lowry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Samet , CO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cedar Wright , CO
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Knight
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]