Gladwill v. Ruby Pipeline, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

Defendant: Ruby Pipeline, LCC
Plaintiff: Alice M. Gladwill
Case Number: 3:2011cv00251
Filed: April 7, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 30 Motion in Limine. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/6/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
January 10, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 52 Proposed Findings. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 10, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (ref 53 Proposed Judgment) in favor of Ruby Pipeline, LCC against Alice M. Gladwill. Plaintiff's request for injunction is DENIED. Defendant has continuing obligation to maintain and repair Right-of-Way easement that traverses Plaintiff's property pursuant to standards promulgated by Federal Energy Regulatory Commission. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 11, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gladwill v. Ruby Pipeline, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Pipeline, LCC
Represented By: James Robert Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice M. Gladwill
Represented By: Robert W Story
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]