Renteria et al v. Canepa

Plaintiff: Denise Renteria, Oscar Renteria and Renteria Family Trust
Defendant: Eugene Cleveland Canepa
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00534
Filed: July 26, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDERED that Plaintiff's # 11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED on the basis of breach of contract. Plaintiff shall be awarded the full contractual amount of $845,000, plus $115,767.12 in interest accrued between May 20 10 and July 2011, and $38,103.15 in late fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may submit a Motion for Attorney's Fees in accordance with Rule 54. The Clerk shall enter the judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 7/3/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 4, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Plaintiffs' Motion for Supplementary Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/4/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 4, 2012 23 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Plaintiffs' Application for Order Setting Judgment Debtor Exam. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/4/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
October 15, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion for Judgment Debtor Exam. Defendant Eugene Cleveland Canepa shall appear at 9:00 a.m. on Monday, November 12, 2012, at the offices of Holland & Hart, LLP, 5441 Kietzke Lane, Second Floor, Reno, Nevada 89511 to answe r questions regarding assets and his means of paying judgment. A copy of this order shall be personally served upon judgment debtor at least fourteen (14) calendar days before the hearing scheduled herein and proof of service filed with the Court. Failure to appear may subject debtor to punishment for contempt of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/15/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 5, 2013 46 Featured Case ORDERED the # 31 Motion to Set Aside Judgment is DENIED. The # 40 Motion to File Surreply is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the # 14 Motion for Attorney's Fees is DENIED. Plaintiffs may submit a renewed motion for fees with proper documentation by 3/20/2013. FURTHER ORDERED the # 37 Motion for Status Conference is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/5/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 19, 2013 61 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion for Charging Order; granting 39 Motion for Sanctions; and granting 49 Motion for Attorney Fees. Eugene Cleveland Canepa's stock in FQ Men's Club, Inc. and Monkey Bars, Inc. is CHARG ED to satisfy judgment. Eugene Cleveland Canepa's membership interest in Western Properties of Nevada is CHARGED to satisfy judgment. Attorney's fees awarded in favor of Renteria Family Trust and against Eugene Cleveland Canepa in amount of $12,677.50. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 31, 2014 73 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Second Motion for Supplementary Proceedings. Plaintiffs shall submit proposed order identifying time and place for examinations of Jonathan Steele and Ennis Jordan by 2/4/2014. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/31/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 5, 2014 75 Featured Case ORDER SETTING EXAMINATION OF JONATHAN S. STEELE, CPA and ENNIS JORDAN re 74 Proposed Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/05/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Renteria et al v. Canepa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Renteria
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Represented By: Stephan Hollandsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Renteria
Represented By: Stephan Hollandsworth
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renteria Family Trust
Represented By: Stephan Hollandsworth
Represented By: Timothy A. Lukas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Cleveland Canepa
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]