Gonzales v. Desert Land, LLC et al

Defendant: Desert Oasis Investments, LLC, Eagle Mortgage Company, Inc., Specialty Mortgage Corp., Specialty Strategic Financing Fund LLC, Specialty Trust, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Desert Land, LLC and Desert Oasis Apartments, LLC
Plaintiff: Tom Gonzales
In Re: Specialty Trust, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00613
Filed: August 25, 2011
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 107 Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 119 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/04/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 25, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 132 Motion for Judgment and denying 133 Motion for Reconsideration and Clarification. Because Plaintiff has not submitted proposed final judgment, Defendants may submit one. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/25/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 28, 2013 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 140 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 10, 2014 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 155 Motion to Stay Proceedings and Judgment Pending Appeal is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 9, 2011 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the 13 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTH ORD that the 17 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTH ORD that the 18 Motion for Hearing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/29/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gonzales v. Desert Land, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Oasis Investments, LLC
Represented By: Emelia L Allen
Represented By: Lenard E. Schwartzer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Mortgage Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: F. DeArmond Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Strategic Financing Fund LLC
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: F. DeArmond Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialty Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Michelle N Kazmar
Represented By: F. DeArmond Sharp
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Land, LLC
Represented By: Lenard E. Schwartzer
Represented By: Emelia L Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Oasis Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Lenard E. Schwartzer
Represented By: Emelia L Allen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Gonzales
Represented By: Ian Christopherson
Represented By: Janet L. Chubb
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Specialty Trust, Inc.
Represented By: Sallie B. Armstrong
Represented By: Ellen M. Bender
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Michelle N Kazmar
Represented By: Ira D. Kharasch
Represented By: Victoria A. Newmark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]