Peri & Sons Farms, Inc. v. Jain Irrigation, Inc. et al

Defendant: Jain Irrigation, Inc. and Agri-Valley Irrigation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Peri & Sons Farms, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00757
Filed: October 20, 2011
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 1/8/2013 granting 114 Motion to Seal Docket No. 100-7. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 15, 2013 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Jain Irrigation, Inc.'s partial motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
February 4, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 105 Jain Irrigation, Inc.'s second Motion in Limine. Please see order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/4/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
October 19, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Judgment shall be entered in favor of Peri & Sons and against Agri-Valley Irrigation, Inc., finding that Agri-Valley breached implied warranty of merchantability and is liable for any and all damages Peri & Sons proves at trial were caused by Agri-Valley's breach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 10/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peri & Sons Farms, Inc. v. Jain Irrigation, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jain Irrigation, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Beko
Represented By: Dale Dorfmeier
Represented By: Daniel T. Hayward
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri-Valley Irrigation, Inc.
Represented By: Dale Dorfmeier
Represented By: Thomas P. Beko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peri & Sons Farms, Inc.
Represented By: Brad M. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]