Lott v. U.S. Department of Labor

Petitioner: William G. Lott
Respondent: U.S. Department of Labor
Case Number: 3:2012cv00228
Filed: April 25, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 30:181 Environment: Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/28/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 9, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that defendant's # 14 Motion for reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the # 36 Report and Recommendation is adopted and accepted, and Petitioner's # 1 Petition for Judicial Review is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Respondent's # 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 26, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lott v. U.S. Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William G. Lott
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Blanck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Department of Labor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.