Firebaugh v. The United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Curtis Firebaugh
Defendant: The United States of America, Tim Vedder and Brian Bertolini
Case Number: 3:2012cv00242
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/20/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 5, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 19 SECOND EX PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS. Proof of service of summons and complaint due by 3/4/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/4/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JK)
February 4, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Firebaugh's # 12 Motion for Entry of Default is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 9, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firebaugh v. The United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Firebaugh
Represented By: Steven F. Bus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Vedder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bertolini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]