January 14, 2014 |
Filing 67
NOTICE - Letter from USSC Clerk to USCA Clerk dtd 1/13/2014. Petition for certiorari denied; re #40 , #41 Notices of Appeal. USSC 13-442 . USCA cases 12-16881, 12-16882) . (DRM)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing 66
NOTICE - Letter from USSC Clerk to USCA Clerk dtd 10/9/2013. Petition for certiorari entered on docket as No. 13-442 . USCA case 12-16881 and 12-16882.(DRM)
|
September 17, 2013 |
Filing 65
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 09/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 16, 2013 |
Filing 64
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for lack of standing. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/16/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 14, 2013 |
Filing 63
ORDER on Mandate as to #40 , #41 Notices of Appeal, #62 USCA Mandate (USCA Case Numbers 12-16881 and 12-16882). Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/14/13. (JC)
|
August 2, 2013 |
Filing 62
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #60 USCA Memorandum/Opinion. USCA Cases 12-16881 and 12-16882. The judgment of this Court, entered July 10, 2013, takes effect this date.(KR)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 61
(1st Notice) PURSUANT TO SPECIAL ORDER 109: that Michael T. Morley is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website to register for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (LG)
|
July 10, 2013 |
Filing 60
OPINION of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #40 and #41 Notices of Appeal. USCA Case 12-16882. REVERSED AND REMANDED. (KR)
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing 59
ORDER GRANTING #55 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/9/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 4, 2013 |
Filing 58
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #40 , #41 Notices of Appeal (USCA Case Numbers 12-16881, 12-16882). Oral argument scheduled Monday, 3/11/13, in San Francisco, CA. (JC)
|
December 7, 2012 |
Filing 57
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #40 , #41 Notices of Appeal (USCA Case Nos. 12-16881, 12-16882). Briefing is completed. (JC)
|
November 7, 2012 |
Filing 56
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #40 Notice of Appeal, #41 Notice of Appeal (USCA Case Numbers 12-16881 and 12-16882) re briefing schedule. (JC)
|
October 24, 2012 |
Filing 55
MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. Motion ripe 10/24/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Prior, Paul)
|
September 13, 2012 |
Filing 54
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on #40 & #41 Notices of Appeal. USCA case 12-16881, 12-16882 .The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (no image attached) (DRM)
|
September 12, 2012 |
Filing 53
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Defendant Nevada Secretary of State re #40 Notice of Appeal. (HJ) Modified on 9/13/2012 to correct document title. (DRM).
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing 52
AMENDED ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit re #49 #50 . See Order for details. (HJ)
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing 51
ORDER DENYING AS MOOT D's #48 Emergency Motion for Clarification or Modification of Order. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
September 5, 2012 |
Filing 50
AMENDED ORDER OF USCA, Ninth Circuit (FOR PUBLICATION), as to #40 Notice of Appeal filed by Ross Miller, #41 Notice of Appeal, filed by Kingsley Edwards. The order issued September 4, 2012 is hereby amended and this amended order is designated for publication. See Order for further specifics. (HJ)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing 49
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit as to #40 Notice of Appeal filed by Ross Miller, #41 Notice of Appeal filed by Kingsley Edwards. Appellants' emergency motions to stay the district court's August 22, 2012 order pending appeal are granted. Appellant Ross Miller's motion for leave to file an oversized emergency motion to stay the district court's August 22, 2012 order is granted. Appellees' motion for leave to file an oversized opposition to appellants' emergency motions to stay the district court's August 22, 2012 order is granted. The briefing schedule established previously shall remain in effect. (HJ)
|
September 4, 2012 |
Filing 48
MOTION Clarification or Modification of Order DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OR MODIFICATION OF ORDER, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO ENTER A WRITTEN ORDER by Defendant Ross Miller. Responses due by 9/21/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Benson, K.)
|
August 30, 2012 |
Filing 47
ORDERED that parties are to file briefs regarding a motion for stay pending appeal on or before Friday, September 7, 2012 and oral argument is set for 09:00AM, Friday, September 14, 2012, in Reno Courtroom 6, Bruce R. Thompson Building and U.S. Courthouse, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/30/2012. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. USCA case # 12-16881, 12-16882 .(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 29, 2012 |
Filing 46
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 39 Motion Hearing held on 8/22/2012, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/27/2012. (MG)
|
August 28, 2012 |
Filing 45
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injuction. (Prior, Paul)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing 44
USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #41 Notice of Appeal filed by Kingsley Edwards. USCA Case Number 12-16882. (MLC)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing 43
USCA ORDER for Time Schedule as to #40 Notice of Appeal filed by Ross Miller. USCA Case Number 12-16881. (MLC)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing 42
FORMS - Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #40 Notice of Appeal, #41 Notice of Appeal. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (DRM)
|
August 25, 2012 |
Filing 41
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 39 Motion Hearing,,,,, by Z Movant Intervenor Defendant Kingsley Edwards. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-2497656. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Parris, John) Modified on 8/27/2012 change party type for Kingsley Edwards. (WJ).
|
August 24, 2012 |
Filing 40
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 39 Motion Hearing,,,,, by Defendant Ross Miller. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-2497404. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Benson, K.)
|
August 22, 2012 |
Filing 39
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #19 Motion to Dismiss, #26 Motion to Intervene held on 8/22/2012 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Michael Morley, Paul Prior; Def Counsel: K, Benson; Intervener: John Parris Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 9:53 - 11:02 a.m.; Courtroom: 6; Court convenes. Appearances are noted on the record. The Court makes preliminary remarks. The #26 Motion to Intervene is granted. The Court then hears arguments of counsel in support of and opposition to the #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, respectively. Following arguments, the Court gives analysis and finds that plaintiffs have satisfied the requirements for preliminary injunction relief. Accordingly, the Court grants #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Defendant Secretary of State Ross Miller, his agents, employees, affiliates, and all those acting in concert with him, are enjoined from allowing "None of these candidates" to appear on voting ballots. Mr. Benson's oral motion to stay pending appeal is denied. Written ruling of the Court will issue. Court adjourns.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
August 6, 2012 |
Filing 38
REPLY to Response to #26 MOTION to Intervene ; filed by Movant Kingsley Edwards. (Parris, John)
|
July 30, 2012 |
Filing 37
REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; filed by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Prior, Paul)
|
July 30, 2012 |
Filing 36
RESPONSE to #26 MOTION to Intervene, filed by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Intervention Replies due by 8/9/2012. (Prior, Paul)
|
July 24, 2012 |
Filing 35
ORDER ON STIPULATION GRANTING #34 Stipulation. The parties stipulate that plaintiff's Reply in Support of their #15 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be due on 7/30/2012. The Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order shall be due on 8/31/2012. (Replies due by 7/30/2012) (Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/31/2012.) Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
July 23, 2012 |
Filing 34
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order for Extension for Plaintiffs' to Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Extension to File Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. (Prior, Paul)
|
July 20, 2012 |
Filing 33
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on July 20, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT is set as follows:WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 22, 2012 @ 10:00AM #15 Plaintiffs Motion for a Preliminary Injunction; #19 Defendants Motion to Dismiss; and #26 Motion for InterventionNOTICE OF HEARING LOCATION: IN PERSON RENO: Before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, COURTROOM 6, Bruce R. Thompson Federal Building & U.S. Courthouse, United States District Court District of Nevada, 400 South Virginia Street, Reno, Nevada 89501.IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Chief Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
July 20, 2012 |
Filing 32
ORDER GRANTING #25 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Michael T. Morley and approving Designation of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior on behalf of all plaintiffs, James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/20/2012. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MLC)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing 31
REPLY to Response to #19 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS ; filed by Defendant Ross Miller. DEFENDANT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS (Benson, K.)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing 30
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on July 19, 2012, by Carrie Lipparelli Judicial Assistant.IT IS HERBY ORDERED that #17 Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Consideration of Their Motion for a Preliminary Injunction Expedited Treatment Requested is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
July 16, 2012 |
Filing 29
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (PM)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing 28
ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Kingsley Edwards.(Parris, John)
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing 27
RESPONSE to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant movant Kingsley Edwards. Replies due by 7/23/2012. (Parris, John) Modified on 7/16/2012 to correct type of filer. (WJ).
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing 26
MOTION to Intervene by Defendant Movant Kingsley Edwards. Responses due by 7/30/2012. (Parris, John) Modified on 7/16/2012 correct filer. (WJ).
|
July 13, 2012 |
Filing 25
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael T. Morley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Paul Swenson Prior (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2442224) filed by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. Motion ripe 7/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Prior, Paul)
|
July 12, 2012 |
Filing 24
RESPONSE to #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Defendant Ross Miller. OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Replies due by 7/22/2012. (Benson, K.)
|
July 9, 2012 |
Filing 23
RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, filed by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Replies due by 7/19/2012. (Prior, Paul)
|
July 9, 2012 |
Filing 22
SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Michael Morley to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 7/27/2012.(no image attached) (WJ)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing 21
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 7/3/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Wayne Julian. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:12-cv-310-RCJ-WGC. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
|
July 3, 2012 |
Filing 20
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (PM)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing 19
MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Ross Miller. Responses due by 7/19/2012. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/12/2012. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/16/2012. (Benson, K.)
|
July 2, 2012 |
Filing 18
ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, DEFENDANT'S ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ross Miller. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/12/2012. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/16/2012.(Benson, K.)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing 17
MOTION to Expedite Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Briefing Schedule and Consideration of their Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. Motion ripe 6/28/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Prior, Paul)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing 16
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury re #15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Points and Authorites in Support of Their Motion for a Preliminary Injunction (Prior, Paul)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing 15
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. Responses due by 7/15/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Paul S. Prior, #2 Declaration Wendy Townley, #3 Declaration Dax Wood, #4 Declaration Wesley Townley, #5 Declaration Jenny Riedl, #6 Declaration Todd Dougan, #7 Declaration Bruce Woodbury, #8 Proposed Order)(Prior, Paul)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing 14
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Ross Miller on 6/21/2012; executed by Todd Dougan, Casja Linford, Amy Whitlock, Heather Thomas, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury, Jenny Reidl, Wendy Townley, James W Degraffenreid, Wesley Townley, Ashley Gunson re #11 Summons Issued, #10 Amended Complaint,. (Prior, Paul)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing 13
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Nevada, State Of on 6/13/2012; executed by Todd Dougan, Casja Linford, Amy Whitlock, Heather Thomas, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury, Jenny Reidl, Wendy Townley, James W Degraffenreid, Wesley Townley, Ashley Gunson. (Prior, Paul)
|
June 28, 2012 |
Filing 12
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Ross Miller on 6/11/2012; executed by Todd Dougan, Casja Linford, Amy Whitlock, Heather Thomas, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury, Jenny Reidl, Wendy Townley, James W Degraffenreid, Wesley Townley, Ashley Gunson re #3 Summons Issued. (Prior, Paul)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing 11
Summons Issued as to Ross Miller re #10 Amended Complaint. (JC)
|
June 20, 2012 |
Filing 10
AMENDED COMPLAINT Amended Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Ross Miller, filed by Todd Dougan, Casja Linford, Amy Whitlock, Heather Thomas, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury, Jenny Reidl, Wendy Townley, James W Degraffenreid, Wesley Townley, Ashley Gunson. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 10/18/2012. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued 6/21/12 Summons to Ross Miller) (Prior, Paul) Modified on 6/21/2012 (JC).
|
June 18, 2012 |
Filing 9
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Prior, Paul)
|
June 13, 2012 |
Filing 8
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones By Deputy Clerk: Lia Griffin. Order of reassignment 7 was entered by the clerk in error. This case remains referred to Chief Judge Jones for reassignment.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
June 13, 2012 |
Filing 7
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 6/13/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Wayne Julian. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 3:12-cv-310-LRH-WGC. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - WJ)
|
June 12, 2012 |
Filing 5
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nevada, State Of. (DRM)
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing 6
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr, on 6/11/2012. IT IS ORDERED that this case is referred to Chief Judge Robert C. Jones for reassignment. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing 4
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to the State of Nevada, filed by Plaintiffs James W Degraffenreid, Todd Dougan, Ashley Gunson, Casja Linford, Jenny Reidl, Heather Thomas, Wendy Townley, Wesley Townley, Amy Whitlock, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury. (Prior, Paul) Modified on 6/12/2012 Issued 6/12/2012 (DRM).
|
June 11, 2012 |
Filing 3
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ross Miller. (DRM)
|
June 8, 2012 |
Filing 2
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Michael T. Morley to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 7/23/2012.(no image attached) (WJ)
|
June 8, 2012 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against State of Nevada, Ross Miller (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-2399403), filed by Casja Linford, Amy Whitlock, Heather Thomas, Dax Wood, Bruce Woodbury, Jenny Reidl, Wendy Townley, James W Degraffenreid, Wesley Townley, Ashley Gunson. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 6/18/2012. Proof of service due by 10/6/2012. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Prior, Paul) Modified on 6/11/2012 to reflect Summons Issued 6/11/2012(DRM).
|
June 8, 2012 |
Case assigned to District Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ) Modified on 6/21/2012 to reflect that WGC will keep case. (WJ).
|