Jacobsen v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al

Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), a Delaware Corporation, Quality Loan Service Corporation, HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA)
Plaintiff: Matt P Jacobsen
Case Number: 3:2012cv00486
Filed: September 11, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Declaratory Judgemen
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that D's # 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED consistent with the reasoning set forth herein. FURTHER ORD that P's # 11 Motion for Leave to File Response is GRANTED. FURTHER ORD that P's Conditional Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORD that P's # 24 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/30/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plaintiff's # 28 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 22, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (# 33 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no further fillings will be accepted in this closed action without leave of the Court. If any party wishes to request leave to file, the requested document shall be attached to a motion explaining why good cause exists for the Court to give leave. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacobsen v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA), a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Laura E. Browning
Represented By: Erica J Stutman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Christopher M Hunter
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Erica J Stutman
Represented By: Laura E. Browning
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Corporation (USA)
Represented By: Laura E. Browning
Represented By: Erica J Stutman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt P Jacobsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]