Avery et al v. Barsky

Plaintiff: Thomas Avery and Kurt Stabel
Defendant: M.D. Sanford Barsky
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00652
Filed: December 12, 2012
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 23 Verfied Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Troy A. Glander, for Plaintiffs Thomas Avery and Kurt Stabel, and Designating Local Counsel Troy I. Isaacson. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/30/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 17, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant's 26 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING Plaintiffs' 29 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 04/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 6, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER on 65 Stipulation re Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/6/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 4, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order and granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Avery et al v. Barsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Avery
Represented By: M. Alex Nava
Represented By: Robert C. Maddox
Represented By: Troy A. Glander
Represented By: Troy L Isaacson
Represented By: Norberto J Cisneros
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Stabel
Represented By: Troy L Isaacson
Represented By: Troy A. Glander
Represented By: Norberto J Cisneros
Represented By: Robert C. Maddox
Represented By: M. Alex Nava
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Sanford Barsky
Represented By: Carolyn K. Renner
Represented By: Donald A. Lattin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]