Williams v. Foster et al

Defendant: S. L. Foster, Rene Baker and Mike Oxborrow
Plaintiff: Tony Williams
Case Number: 3:2012cv00660
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 application to proceed IFP; however, plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee within 30 days. The Clerk shall send plaintiff two copies of this order, one to be attached to the filing fee payment ch eck. The NV Department of Corrections shall pay to the USDC NV Clerk 20 percent of the preceding month's deposits to plaintiff's account in the months that the account exceeds $10 until the full $350 filing fee has been paid. The Clerk shall SEND a copy of this order to the Finance Division of the Clerks Office (NEF sent 9/25/2013) and the Chief of Inmate Services for the NV Department of Corrections (mailed 9/25/2013). The Clerk shall serve this order and the 10 amended complaint on NV AG's Office, Attn: Kat Howe (served 9/25/2013). AG to advise court within 21 days regarding service (see order for instructions on service). Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 09/24/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court SCREENING ORDER - The amended complaint will proceed against defendants Oxborrow, Baker, and Foster on the single claim in Count 1 of denied equal protection. All other claims and defendants are dismissed with prejudice. The Court's 13 Orde r is vacated. The matter of the IFP application remains deferred. The 15 motion to withdraw is granted. The 8 and 14 motions for service are denied as moot. This action is stayed for 90 days to allow opportunity to settle. If case does not settle, plaintiff will be required to pay the full $350 filing fee. The Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this order and the amended complaint on NV AG's Office Attn: Kat Howe (e-served 10/2/2013). AG to advise court within 21 days regarding service. See document for further details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/02/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 17, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - (1) Defendants' # 26 Motion to strike Plaintiff's response to Defendants' answer is GRANTED and the # 22 Response to the answer is STRICKEN; (2) Defendant's # 26 Motion to strike the Second Amended Complaint is DENIED; (3) Plaintiff's # 27 Motion for leave to amend is GRANTED; (4) Plaintiff may PROCEED with his claims in his # 25 Second Amended Complaint against defendants Foster, Baker and Oxborrow as specified. (5) Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the # 25 Second Amended Complaint by 3/31/2014. (6) The following deadlines from the scheduling order previously entered in this case (Doc. # 21) are amended as follows (all other deadlines and provisions shall remain in place): (a) Discovery in this action shall be completed on or before 90 days from the date of this Order; (b) Any discovery motion shall be filed and served no later than 105 days from the date of this Order; (c) Any party who desires to further amend the scheduling order must file a motion and make a good cause showing. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/14/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 9, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 6/9/2014, denying as moot Plaintiff's 53 Motion for Order, re Plaintiff's 60 Notice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Foster et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. L. Foster
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Oxborrow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]