Burke et al v. USF Reddaway, Inc.

Plaintiff: James Burke and Alyssa Burke
Defendant: USF Reddaway, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00017
Filed: January 10, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/7/13 ORDERING that while the convenience of the parties weighs against transfer due to the general strong presumption in favor of a plaintiff's choice of forum, the remaining factors, including the convenience of non-party witnesses, weigh more heavily in favor of transfer. Therefore, defendant's motion to transfer venue is GRANTED; CASE TRANSFERRED to District of Nevada, Reno Division. (Becknal, R)[Transferred from California Eastern on 1/10/2013.]
December 19, 2013 55 Featured Case ORDER re 49 and 52 Motions: An expedited briefing schedule and hearing are not necessary. A hearing will be scheduled after briefing is completed. Compliance with the subpoenas at issue is STAYED pending further order of the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 9, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER - Plaintiff is ordered to file any response to Defendant's # 60 Motion to Quash Subpoena on or before 12:00 p.m. on Monday, January 13, 2014. Counsel shall provide chambers with a courtesy copy of this document by the s ame deadline. Defendant shall have up to and including 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, January 14, 2014, to file any reply memoranda. Counsel shall provide chambers with a courtesy copy of this document by the same deadline. Dr. Sanders' compliance with the subpoena is STAYED pending resolution of Defendant's motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 14, 2014 71 Featured Case MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 1/14/2014 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Douglas Rochen; Def Counsel: Austin Oyler (Telephonically) and Jacey Prupas; FTR #: 1:32:51 p.m. - 2:52:03 p.m.; Time of Hearing: 1:30 p.m.; Courtroom: 2. Defendant's 49 Motion to Quash is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. See attached minutes of proceedings order for details. Defendant's 60 Motion to Quash is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
February 25, 2014 82 Featured Case ORDER re 49 MOTION to Quash and Production of Redacted Vazeen Records. Counsel for Defendant directed to produce redacted records in accordance with attached order. Counsel for Defendant shall contact Courtroom Administrator Katie Ogden (775-686-5758) to make arrangements to pick up records submitted in camera. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 10, 2014 92 Featured Case ORDER overruling plaintiff's 77 objection; affirming the magistrate judge's 71 order granting defendant's motion to quash. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Burke et al v. USF Reddaway, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burke
Represented By: Douglas Adam Rochen
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Burke
Represented By: Douglas Adam Rochen
Represented By: Brian S. Kabateck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF Reddaway, Inc.
Represented By: Geoffrey Owen Evers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]