Hernandez v. Baker et al

Defendant: Huston Robert, David Marr, Lightsey Rod, Christian Rowley, Paul Malay, Rigney, Lying, Kane, Irvine Lorena, Renee Baker and Drummond
Plaintiff: Inginio Hernandez
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00083
Filed: February 21, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2014 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 98 Motion. Plaintiff's apparent attempt to allow Plaintiff to file a reply to Defendants' answer is DENIED. If Plaintiff is seeking summary judgment, he should file the appropriate motion. Please see attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 14, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 99 "This Motion be Brought Shall on Good Faithfully for Good Cause to Shown Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 13 Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure Civ. P. 13 on That Basis for my Seriousy (sic) Medical Need Can be Relief Hereby Declare and State as Follows Upon Be Plaintiff Claimed." Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 17, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 102 "Motion for Seeks From the Honorable Court Permission for Enlargement of Time to File Those Motions and Hereby Declare and State as Follows Upon." Request for extension of discovery deadlines is denied. Extension of time to file dispositive motions is granted. (Motions due by 2/15/2015.) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 22, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Application to proceed IFP 1 is GRANTED. Monthly payments due until filing fee paid in full (copy of order sent via NEF to finance and via USPS to Chief of Inmate Services). Clerk shall electronically serve copy of this order a nd copy of amended complaint 11 on AG's Office (service completed 10/22/13). Within 21 days, AG's Office shall advise Court as to acceptance of service (see attached for details). Answer due in 60 days for represented defendants. Plaintiff to serve defendants copies of all pleadings. Motions 9 , 14 , 15 , and 16 are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 5, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 3/5/2014, granting 48 Motion to Stay Briefing re 47 Motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 30, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 4/30/2014, denying 56 Motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 1, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 5/1/2014, denying Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Issuance of Summons; requiring Defendants to file a supplemental notice of acceptance as to Defendants Kelly Lyon and Correctional Officer Lyon within seven days (by 5/8/2014). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 21, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue a summons for Defendant Erik Lyons and send it to the USM with the 67 address provided under seal (delivered 5/21/2014). The Clerk shall send to Plaintiff a USM-285 form, a copy of 11 amended complaint, and a c opy of this order (mailed 5/21/2014). Plaintiff shall have 20 days to complete the USM-285 form and return it along with other necessary documents to the USM for service (by 6/10/2014). Plaintiff shall file a notice informing the court of the status of service after receiving that information from the USM. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 13, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/13/2014, denying Plaintiff's 79 Motion. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 13, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING P's # 80 Motion. The Clerk shall substitute Gloria Carpenter and Michael Deweese for the fictitious party John Does. AG shall advise the court by 8/23/2014 service accepted on behalf of Ms. Carpenter and Mr. Deweese, or fi le their last known addresses under seal. If service is accepted an answer due within twenty-one days of the date the notice of acceptance of service is filed. If service not accepted, then P must file a motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hernandez v. Baker et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huston Robert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Marr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lightsey Rod
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Rowley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Malay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lying
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irvine Lorena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drummond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inginio Hernandez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]