Randolph v. The State of Nevada, Ex Rel, Nevada Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Charles Randolph
Defendant: James Gregory Cox, Inspector General Pam Del Porto, Embarq Communications, Inc., E.K. McDaniel, Renee Baker, Century Link Sales Solutions, Inc. and The State of Nevada, Ex Rel, Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2013cv00148
Filed: March 25, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 100 Response/Motion; denying 80 and 82 motions filed by Travers Greene; denying as moot document 81 filed by Travers Greene; denying as moot NDOC Defendants' 92 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/24/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 13, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion to Dispense with Local Rule of Special Proceeding 2-1; denying without prejudice 104 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint within 20 days. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 21, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART # 109 Motion for TRO. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are PRELIMINARILY ENJOINED from listening to Plaintiff's privileged attorney-client communications from any phone number ( See pdf order for additional specifics. ) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 25, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 11/25/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Katie Lynn Ogden. Plaintiff's 134 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum is GRANTED. The deputy clerk is directed to issue and send to Mr. Randolph the requested subpoena. Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Discovery and Related Deadlines is GRANTED. Amended discovery deadlines: Discovery cut-off: 1/8/2015; Discovery motions: 1/23/2015; Dispositive motions: 2/6/2015; Joint Pre-Trial Order: 3/9/2015. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
July 12, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Motion to Substitute Party : Defendant Embarq Payphone Services, Inc., shall be substituted as a defendant herein in place of Defendants Century Link Sales Solutions, Inc., and Embarq Communications, Inc. Defendants Centur y Link Sales Solutions, Inc., and Embarq Communications, Inc., are therefore DISMISSED from this action. Plaintiffs # 27 Motion for enlargement of time to effect service is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 29, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in its entirety with prejudice Embarq Payphone Services Inc's 5 Motion to Dismiss; denying 25 Joinder to 5 Motion to Dismiss; denying 39 Objections re 37 and 38 Orders. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/29/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 7, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 52 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum and Leave to Serve Same via Certified Mail Upon Third Party. The Clerk's Office is directed to send Plaintiff a subpoena duces tecum issued to Embarq Pay Phone Servic es, Inc. (issued and mailed to Plaintiff 1/8/2014). In view of the discrepancies surrounding Embarq's Nevada corporate status or its resident agent, if any, the court at this time declines to specifically authorize service in the mode Plaintiff has requested. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 19, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 renewed motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 02/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 27, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas. Clerk to issue two blank subpoenas to Plaintiff (issued and mailed to plaintiff 2/28/14). Plaintiff responsible for filling out subpoenas and properly serving them. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 16, 2014 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 motion to certify judgment as final; denying as moot 44 motion to stay; and denying 45 motion to reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/16/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randolph v. The State of Nevada, Ex Rel, Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Randolph
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gregory Cox
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspector General Pam Del Porto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Embarq Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Represented By: Mark M. Iba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Link Sales Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Mark M. Iba
Represented By: Matthew C. Addison
Represented By: Francis D. Tankard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Nevada, Ex Rel, Nevada Department of Corrections
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]