Divald v. Salay et al

Defendant: James K. Salay and Stephanie V. Salay
Plaintiff: Mary Anne Divald
Case Number: 3:2013cv00199
Filed: April 18, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 Letter/application for status check as to the disposition of motions pending. The motions referenced herein do not fall within the category that requires expedited disposition and will therefore be decided in the order of pending motions in civil cases. Oral argument will be scheduled if the Court determines argument is necessary. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/25/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 18, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment.; granting 15 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Default. Defendant James K. Salay's answer to complaint due by 12/12/2013. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/18/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 29, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 defendant's motion to request continuance. The case management conference shall commence on Friday, January 31, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom One. Defendant is required to personally appear at the case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/29/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
February 4, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 34 Notice of Change of Attorney : Attorney Sarah V. Carrasco in the place and stead of pro per litigant James K. Salay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/3/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 19, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 5/19/2014, denying Defendant's 63 motion for continuance. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Divald v. Salay et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Salay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie V. Salay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Anne Divald
Represented By: Sophie A. Karadanis
Represented By: Richard G. Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]