Galvan v. Nationstar Mortgage

Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS), McCarthy & Holthus, MILA, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Aurora Loan Services, Nationstar Mortgage and Quality Loan Services
Plaintiff: Glenn Galvan
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00234
Filed: May 7, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
 
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED # 1 IFP Application is GRANTED. Clerk shall FILE the complaint. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration together with a certificate of service. Clerk shall ISSUE summons for Ds and deliver same to U SM for service. (Delivered to USM 10/22/2013.) Clerk shall SEND P copies of complaint and USM-285 forms for each D. ( Mailed to P 10/22/2013. ) P shall furnish USM forms and copies by 11/11/2013. P must file a notice re unserved Ds; and file a motion if P wshes to have service attempted on an unserved Ds. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 2, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 39 request for clerk's entry of default. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 01/02/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 18, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Remand; granting with prejudice 9 Motion to Dismiss; denying 18 Motion for Leave to File [Sur]-Reply; denying 22 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; denying as moot 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Second Judicial District Court case CV 12-02785 is remanded to that court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 02/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 29, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 54 Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 8, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 62 USCA REFFERAL NOTICE : This Court certifies that any in forma pauperis appeal from its order of dismissal and order denying motion for reconsideration would be frivolous. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status should be revoked on appeal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/8/2014. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit re USCA Case 14-16683. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Galvan v. Nationstar Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems (MERS)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarthy & Holthus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Galvan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]