Hillsman et al v. Morgan et al

Appellee: Rosalie Allen Morgan
Appellant: Robert G. Hillsman
In Re: Rosalie Allen Morgan
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00256
Filed: May 20, 2013
 
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 15 Featured Case ORDER VACATING 8 Order. Clerk shall reopen the case. Appellant shall have 14 days to file opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days thereafter to file answering brief. Appellant shall have 14 days thereafter to file reply brief. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 30, 2014 27 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER - The order of the Bankruptcy Court is AFFIRMED. FURTHER ORDERED that the # 22 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 17, 2014 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss and granting 7 Motion for Summary Judgment as a motion to dismiss. The clerk shall close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hillsman et al v. Morgan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rosalie Allen Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Robert G. Hillsman
Represented By: Adam P. Bowler
Represented By: I. Scott Bogatz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Rosalie Allen Morgan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]