England v. Baca et al

Defendant: Lisa Walsh, James Stogner, F. Dreesen and Isidro Baca
Plaintiff: William England
Case Number: 3:2014cv00189
Filed: April 9, 2014
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 9 motion to extend 90 day stay, and vacating 8 order and the procedures, time tables and other requirements set forth therein. AG shall file supplemental status report by 11/5/2014. Clerk shall send copy of this order to Chief of Inmate Services (mailed 8/27/14; finance notified via NEF). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/27/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 6, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER IFP Application 1 is granted. Monthly payments due until full filing fee paid (copy of order sent via NEF to finance and via mail to NDOC). Clerk shall electronically serve copy of order and copy of complaint 4 on AG's Office (served via NEF 11/6/14). Within 21 days, AG's Office shall advise Court re acceptance of service. Answer for any represented defendants due within 60 days. Henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon defendants copy of all pleadings submitted to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 19, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS - This case will not be referred for formal mediation. The parties are encouraged to engage in settlement discussions. Clerk shall provide Ds' counsel a courtesy copy this order and the complain t. (E-service 5/20/2014; # 4 Complaint via NEF regeneration.) If case settles the $350 filing fee need not be paid. If Parties unable to settle, then P will have to pay the $350 filing fee either immediately or from inmate trust account. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 8, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 1 is granted. Plaintiff not required to pay initial installment. Monthly payments due until filing fee paid (copy of order sent via NEF to finance and via USPS to Chie f of Inmate Services 8/8/14). Clerk shall eserve copy of this order and complaint 4 on AG's Office (served via NEF 8/8/14). Within 21 days, AG's Office shall file notice advising Court re acceptance of service (see attached for details) . Answer for any represented defendants due within 60 days. Henceforth, Plaintiff shall serve upon defendants copies of all pleadings submitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/8/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: England v. Baca et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stogner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Dreesen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William England
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]