Bank of America v. Viders

Case Number: 2:2010cv00025
Filed: January 5, 2010
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Referring Judge: Arlene R. Lindsay
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 17 Motion to Stay: Lender's motion for summary judgement is granted on liability. Viders' cross- motion is denied. This matter is hereby respectfully r eferred to Magistrate Judge Lindsay pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b) to determine the amount of damages, including attorneys' fees. Further, the scope of the foregoing reference shall be deemed to encompass such additional authority as reasonable or necessary to perform the foregoing duties and as is not inconsistent with the Constitution and laws of the United States. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 12/28/2010. (Gapinski, Michele)
January 3, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Referred Motion: See attached order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/3/2011. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
September 23, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION (docket no. 33 ) in toto and granting in part, and denying in part as moot, plaintiff's Motion for Damages (docket no. 27 ). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment as set forth in the attached Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 9/23/2011. (Malley, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America v. Viders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]