Easton LLC v. Inc. Village of Muttontown

Plaintiff: Easton LLC
Defendant: Inc. Village of Muttontown
Case Number: 2:2011cv04791
Filed: October 3, 2011
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Referring Judge: E. Thomas Boyle
Presiding Judge: Leonard D. Wexler
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 11 Motion for Order to Show Cause; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: For the reasons contained in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, defendant's motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint is granted and this action is dismissed in its entirety. Plaintiff's cross-motion for a preliminary injunction is denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to mark this case closed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 4/27/2012. (Minerva, Deanna)
March 15, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion to Disqualify Judge: For the reasons contained in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, plaintiff's motion for recusal is denied in its entirety. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/15/2013. (Minerva, Deanna)
March 19, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Motion to Dismiss: For the reasons contained in the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order, defendants motion to dismiss plaintiffs remaining state law claims is granted and those claims are dismissed. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and to mark this case closed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge E. Thomas Boyle on 3/19/2013. (Minerva, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easton LLC v. Inc. Village of Muttontown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Easton LLC
Represented By: Stephen P. Conlon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inc. Village of Muttontown
Represented By: Steven G. Leventhal
Represented By: Thomas J. Mullaney
Represented By: Christine Helen Price
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]