TradeComet.Com LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: TradeComet.Com LLC
Defendant: Google, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2009cv01400
Filed: February 17, 2009
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Sidney H. Stein
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:2 Antitrust Litigation

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2010 Featured Case Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Google, Inc., 36 Notice of Change of Address filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 39 Clerk's Judgment, 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Google, Inc., 31 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 11 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment, 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 9 Notice of Change of Address filed by Google, Inc., 27 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Google, Inc., 15 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Google, Inc., 18 MOTION for Susan A. Creighton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Google, Inc., 4 Notice of Appearance filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 1 Complaint filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 40 Notice of Appeal filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 37 Notice of Change of Address filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 34 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 26 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 25 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 24 Certificate of Service Other, filed by Google, Inc., 3 Notice of Appearance filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 20 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 5 Summons Returned Executed filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 14 MOTION for Charles F. Rule to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 32 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Google, Inc., 38 Memorandum & Opinion,,, 29 Certificate of Service Other, filed by Google, Inc., 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 30 MOTION to Strike Document No. 28 / Exhibits D, E, F, G and H of the Declaration of Sara Ciarelli Walsh. filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 33 Certificate of Service Other filed by Google, Inc., 21 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. filed by Google, Inc., 13 MOTION for Jonathan S. Kanter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 22 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Google, Inc., 10 Notice of Appearance filed by Google, Inc., 35 Notice of Change of Address filed by TradeComet.Com LLC, 23 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Google, Inc., 12 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines, 8 Notice of Change of Address filed by Google, Inc., 28 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Google, Inc., 16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
March 16, 2010 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 40 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
March 16, 2010 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 40 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
March 15, 2010 40 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL from 39 Clerk's Judgment, 38 Memorandum & Opinion,. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 896979. (nd)
March 12, 2010 39 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated March 5, 2010, Google's motion to dismiss the complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(3) is granted, and TradeComet's motion to strike Exhibits D through H of the Walsh Declaration is denied. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 3/12/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
August 6, 2009 37 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Charles F. Rule on behalf of TradeComet.Com LLC. New Address: Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft, 700 Sixth Street, N.W., Washington, DC, USA 20001, (202) 862-2200. (Rule, Charles)
August 5, 2009 36 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph J Bial on behalf of TradeComet.Com LLC. New Address: Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft, 700 Sixth Street, N.W., Washington, DC, USA 20001, (202) 862-2200. (Bial, Joseph)
August 5, 2009 35 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Daniel Joseph Howley, Jr on behalf of TradeComet.Com LLC. New Address: Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP, 700 Sixth Street, N.W., Washington, DC, USA 20001, (202) 862-2200. (Howley, Daniel)
April 28, 2009 34 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Strike Document No. 28 / Exhibits D, E, F, G and H of the Declaration of Sara Ciarelli Walsh.. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bial, Joseph)
April 27, 2009 33 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 27, 2009 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 30 MOTION to Strike Document No. 28 / Exhibits D, E, F, G and H of the Declaration of Sara Ciarelli Walsh. Google Inc.'s MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Tradecomet.com LLC's Motion to Strike Exhibits D,E,F,G,and H of the Walsh Declaration. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 24, 2009 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 30 MOTION to Strike Document No. 28 / Exhibits D, E, F, G and H of the Declaration of Sara Ciarelli Walsh.. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bial, Joseph)
April 24, 2009 30 Featured Case MOTION to Strike Document No. 28 / Exhibits D, E, F, G and H of the Declaration of Sara Ciarelli Walsh. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC.(Bial, Joseph)
April 22, 2009 29 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law In Support Of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Declaration Of Sara Ciarelli Walsh In Support Of Defendant's Motion To Dismiss served on Charles F. Rule, Joseph J. Bial, Jonathan Kanter, Daniel Howley on April 22, 2009. Service was made by Electronic mail. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 22, 2009 28 Featured Case DECLARATION of Sara Ciarelli Walsh in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 22, 2009 27 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 15, 2009 26 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel J. Howley in Opposition re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Howley, Daniel)
April 15, 2009 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bial, Joseph)
March 31, 2009 24 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue and Declaration of Heather Wilburn in Support of Motion to Dismiss with exhibits served on Charles F. Rule, Joseph Bial, Jonathan Kanter and Daniel Howley on March 31, 2009. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
March 31, 2009 23 Featured Case DECLARATION of Heather Wilburn in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Jacobson, Jonathan)
March 31, 2009 22 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue.. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
March 31, 2009 21 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Based on Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Improper Venue. Document filed by Google, Inc..(Jacobson, Jonathan)
March 19, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/09/2009, Receipt Number 680700. (jd)
March 17, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Any document demands plaintiff serves on defendant shall be returnable within 10 days; 2. Defendant shall move to dismiss the complaint for improper venue or lack of jurisdiction based on improper venue on or before March 31, 2009; 3. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion is due on or before April 15, 2009; and 4. Defendant's reply to its motion is due on or before April 22, 2009. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/17/09) (js)
March 13, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jfe)
March 13, 2009 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF SUSAN A. CREIGHTON: granting 18 Motion for Susan A. Creighton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/13/2009) (jfe)
March 12, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 02/27/2009, Receipt Number 680046. (jd)
March 10, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (cd)
March 10, 2009 17 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 14 Motion for Charles F Rule to Appear Pro Hac Vice for TradeComet.com LLC. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/9/09) (cd)
March 10, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (cd)
March 10, 2009 16 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting 13 Motion for Jonathan S. Kanter to Appear Pro Hac Vice FOR TradeComet.com LLC. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/9/09) (cd)
March 10, 2009 15 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Google, Inc..(Jacobson, Jonathan)
March 9, 2009 18 Featured Case MOTION for Susan A. Creighton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc.(dle)
March 5, 2009 14 Featured Case MOTION for Charles F. Rule to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC.(dle)
March 3, 2009 12 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER For the reasons set forth in this order, Plaintiff and defendant agree that, Google will have until April 7, 2009, to respond to the complaint (a 28-day extension of time). (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/3/09) (mme)
February 27, 2009 13 Featured Case MOTION for Jonathan S. Kanter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC.(dle)
February 27, 2009 11 Featured Case NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Sidney H. Stein. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case due to a Judge's Recusal. (ama)
February 27, 2009 10 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chul Pak on behalf of Google, Inc. (Pak, Chul)
February 26, 2009 9 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Google, Inc.. New Address: Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor, New York, New York, 10019, 212-497-7758. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
February 26, 2009 8 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sara Beth Ciarelli on behalf of Google, Inc.. New Address: Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, 1301 Avenue of the Americas, 40th Floor, New York, New York, 10019, 212-497-7759. (Ciarelli, Sara)
February 26, 2009 7 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Google, Inc. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
February 26, 2009 6 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Beth Ciarelli on behalf of Google, Inc. (Ciarelli, Sara)
February 23, 2009 5 Featured Case SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Google, Inc. served on 2/18/2009, answer due 3/10/2009. Service was accepted by Chad Matice, Clerk, NY State Secretary of State. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC. (Howley, Daniel)
February 20, 2009 4 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph J Bial on behalf of TradeComet.Com LLC (Bial, Joseph)
February 20, 2009 3 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Joseph Howley, Jr on behalf of TradeComet.Com LLC (Howley, Daniel)
February 17, 2009 2 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC.(ama)
February 17, 2009 Featured Case Case Designated ECF. (ama)
February 17, 2009 Featured Case Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (ama)
February 17, 2009 Featured Case SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, Inc. (ama)
February 17, 2009 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 679502)Document filed by TradeComet.Com LLC.(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: TradeComet.Com LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TradeComet.Com LLC
Represented By: Charles F. Rule
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]