Hester v. Neverson et al Featured Case

Television personality David Hester of A&E's 'Storage Wars' reality TV show, filed a trademark lawsuit seeking a declaratory judgment that his "Yuuup!" moniker does not infringe upon rapper Trey Songz's purported intellectual property claims to variations of the phrase.

Defendant: Tremaine Neverson and Trey Songz Productions, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: David Hester
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv08163
Filed: November 15, 2011
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Katherine B. Forrest
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2012 23 ANSWER to 20 Amended Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against David Hester. Document filed by Trey Songz Productions, L.L.C., Tremaine Neverson.(Licht, Jeremy)
March 13, 2012 21 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff David Hester's complaint (Dkt. No.1) is DENIED AS MOOT upon plaintiff's filing of his Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. 20). The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate defendants' motion (Dkt. No. 14). (Signed by Judge Katherine B. Forrest on 3/13/2012) (mro)
March 8, 2012 20 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Tremaine Neverson, Trey Songz Productions, L.L.C. Document filed by David Hester. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by David Hester.(cd)
November 10, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Tremaine Neverson, Trey Songz Productions, L.L.C. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1021647)Document filed by David Hester.(tro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hester v. Neverson et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tremaine Neverson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trey Songz Productions, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hester
Represented By: Kieran Gerard Doyle
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]