Paramount Pictures Corporation v. Puzo Featured Case

Counter_claimant: Anthony Puzo
Counter_defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Plaintiff: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Defendant: Anthony Puzo
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01268
Filed: February 17, 2012
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Alison J. Nathan
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2012 Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the termination of this action. (ml)
December 20, 2012 32 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation.(Kendall, Richard)
October 2, 2012 31 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bertram Fields dated 10/1/2012 re: Counsel requests that the Court reschedule the status conference presently set for January 11, 2013 to January 25th. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Conference previously set for 1/11/2013 is hereby ADJOURNED and RESET to 1/25/13 at 10:45 a.m. (Status Conference set for 1/25/2013 at 10:45 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 10/2/2012) (djc)
September 26, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/11/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (js)
September 26, 2012 30 Featured Case ORDER AND OPINION: #102434 For the forgoing reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that Paramount's motion to dismiss the Estate's counterclaim for breach of contract is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that Paramount's motion to dismiss the Estate's counterclaims for cancellation, rescission, and tortious interference is GRANTED; and it is finally ORDERED that the parties appear for a status conference before the Court on January 11, 2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17B of the United States Courthouse for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. The parties are reminded of the deadlines contained in this Court's case management order, Dkt. #19, and of the Court's intention to enforce those deadlines. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/26/2012) (js) Modified on 10/3/2012 (jab).
August 30, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Oral Argument held on 8/30/2012 re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Restated Counterclaim. filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. Decision reserved. Order to follow. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Tom Murray) (snu)
July 17, 2012 29 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Restated Counterclaim.. Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Kendall, Richard)
July 3, 2012 28 DECLARATION of Bertram Fields in Opposition re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Restated Counterclaim.. Document filed by Anthony Puzo(as executor of the Estate of Mario Puzo). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shulman, Motty)
July 3, 2012 27 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Restated Counterclaim.. Document filed by Anthony Puzo(as executor of the Estate of Mario Puzo). (Shulman, Motty)
June 25, 2012 26 DECLARATION of Nicholas F. Daum in Support re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Restated Counterclaim.. Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit D (Continued))(Daum, Nicholas)
June 25, 2012 25 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Nicholas F. Daum dated 6/12/2012 re: Paramount requests that the Interim Settlement Agreement be filed under seal. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Paramount shall file electronically its redacted declaration. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/25/2012) (djc)
June 25, 2012 24 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
June 12, 2012 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Restated Counterclaim.. Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Kendall, Richard)
June 12, 2012 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended and Restated Counterclaim. Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. Responses due by 7/3/2012(Kendall, Richard)
May 22, 2012 21 ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint., COUNTERCLAIM against Paramount Pictures Corporation. Document filed by Anthony Puzo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Shulman, Motty)
May 16, 2012 20 Featured Case ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED: That Plaintiff indicate by May 29, 2012 whether it intends to separately move to dismiss the amended counterclaims or whether it rests on the arguments raised in its original motion to dismiss; That if Plaintiff elects not to file a new motion to dismiss, then Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs original motion to dismiss must be filed on or before June 12,2012, Plaintiffs reply in support of its motion must be filed on or before June 26, 2012, and oral argument will be held August 8, 2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17B; And that if Plaintiff does elect to file a new motion to dismiss, such motion must be filed on or before June 12,2012, Defendant's opposition to Plaintiffs new motion to dismiss must be filed on or before July 3, 2012, Plaintiff's reply in support of its motion must be filed on or before July 17, 2012, and oral argument will be held August 30, 2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17B., ( Motions due by 6/12/2012., Responses due by 7/3/2012., Replies due by 7/17/2012.), ( Oral Argument set for 8/30/2012 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/16/2012) (lmb)
May 14, 2012 19 Featured Case CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not 'consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). Settlement discussions have not taken place.The parties have conferred pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). This case is to be tried to a jury Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within30 days from the date of this Order Deposition due by 12/15/2012. Fact Discovery due by 12/31/2012. Expert Discovery due by 2/15/2013. Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Ready for Trial by 4/10/2013. Summary Judgment motions are to be filed within 30 days of the close of discovery (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/14/2012) (js) .
May 11, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alison J. Nathan: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/11/2012. (snu)
May 8, 2012 18 DECLARATION of Nicholas F. Daum in Support re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims.. Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Daum, Nicholas)
May 8, 2012 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. (re-filed to correct ECF error). Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. (Kendall, Richard)
May 8, 2012 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. Responses due by 5/21/2012(Kendall, Richard)
April 12, 2012 9 ANSWER to 8 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Paramount Pictures Corporation. Document filed by Anthony Puzo.(Shulman, Motty)
April 2, 2012 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Anthony Puzo.Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation.(ft)
March 26, 2012 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bertram Harris Fields on behalf of Anthony Puzo (Fields, Bertram)
March 23, 2012 6 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Bertram Fields dated 3/22/2012 re: Counsel for the Defendant writes to request an adjournment of the initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for 5/4/2012. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to 5/11/2012 at 11:30 AM. (Initial Conference set for 5/11/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/23/2012) (ab)
March 14, 2012 5 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/4/2012 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/14/2012) (cd)
March 12, 2012 4 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Paramount Pictures Corporation. Document filed by Anthony Puzo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 02-14-10 Letter, # 2 Exhibit B 05-23-11 Letter)(Shulman, Motty)
February 17, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Anthony Puzo. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401030234)Document filed by Paramount Pictures Corporation.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Paramount Pictures Corporation v. Puzo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Anthony Puzo
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas Frederic Daum
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: G. Robert Gage, Jr.
Represented By: Richard B. Kendall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: Richard B. Kendall
Represented By: G. Robert Gage, Jr.
Represented By: William B. Fleming
Represented By: Nicholas Frederic Daum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Puzo
Represented By: Motty Shulman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]