Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc. v. Issa et al Featured Case

A continuing legal education company headed by Joseph Marino (inset, left), the legendary force behind a 65-year-old family-owned New York and New Jersey bar exam course, sued a former employee for alleged theft of "invaluable data" from his more recent CLE company's business.

Plaintiff: Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc.
Defendant: Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation, Matt Partain, MP Innovations, Inc. and IPLS Global
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv04320
Filed: June 1, 2012
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Victor Marrero
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2012 16 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc..Document filed by Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation.(Nesci, Vincent)
July 2, 2012 15 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Vincent P Nesci on behalf of Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation. New Address: Vincent P. Nesci, P.C., 487 E Main St, # 325, Mount Kisco, New York, 10549, 914-265-5780. (Nesci, Vincent)
June 22, 2012 14 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Vincent P Nesci on behalf of Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation. New Address: Vincent P. Nesci. P.C., 487 E Main Street, # 325, Mount Kisco, New York, 10549-3420, (914) 265-5780. (Nesci, Vincent)
June 22, 2012 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. IPLS Global served on 6/11/2012, answer due 7/2/2012. Service was accepted by S. Vann, Office Manager. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc.. (Weber, Dorothy)
June 22, 2012 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. MP Innovations, Inc. served on 6/6/2012, answer due 6/27/2012. Service was accepted by L. Towner, Employee. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc.. (Weber, Dorothy)
June 22, 2012 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Matt Partain served on 6/8/2012, answer due 6/29/2012. Service was accepted by L. Towner, Employee. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc.. (Weber, Dorothy)
June 22, 2012 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer and related pleadings served on All counsel on 06/21/2012. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation. (Nesci, Vincent)
June 21, 2012 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent P Nesci on behalf of Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation (Nesci, Vincent)
June 21, 2012 8 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation.(Nesci, Vincent)
June 21, 2012 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation.(Nesci, Vincent)
June 15, 2012 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by MP Innovations, Inc., Matt Partain.(Weissman, Edward)
June 15, 2012 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MP Innovations, Inc., Matt Partain.(Weissman, Edward)
June 7, 2012 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Lionyx Solutions Corporation served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. Service was accepted by Omar Issa. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc.. (Weber, Dorothy)
June 7, 2012 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Omar Issa served on 6/4/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. Service was accepted by Omar Issa. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc.. (Weber, Dorothy)
June 1, 2012 2 Featured Case STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jfe)
June 1, 2012 Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (jfe)
June 1, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (jfe)
June 1, 2012 Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis is so designated. (jfe)
June 1, 2012 SUMMONS ISSUED as to IPLS Global, Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation, MP Innovations, Inc., Matt Partain. (jfe)
June 1, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against IPLS Global, Omar Issa, Lionyx Solutions Corporation, MP Innovations, Inc., Matt Partain. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1039871)Document filed by Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc..(jfe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc. v. Issa et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marino Institute of Continuing Legal Education, Inc.
Represented By: Dorothy M Weber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar Issa
Represented By: Vincent P Nesci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lionyx Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Vincent P Nesci
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Partain
Represented By: Edward Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MP Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Weissman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPLS Global
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]