National Hockey League et al v. National Hockey League Players' Association et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Lincoln Hockey L.L.C., San Jose Sharks, L.L.C., St. Louis Blues Hockey Club, L.P., Winnipeg Jets Hockey Club Limited Partnership, Pittsburgh Penguins L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Vancouver Canucks Limited Partnership, Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Nashville Hockey Club Limited Partnership, New Jersey Devils, L.L.C., New York Islanders Hockey Club, L.P., The Madison Square Garden Company, Capital Sports & Entertainment, Inc., Philadelphia Flyers Limited Partnership, Coyotes Newco, L.L.C., The Los Angeles Kings Hockey Club, L.P., Minnesota Wild Hockey Club, L.P., National Hockey League, Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, L.L.C., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Hockey Western New York, L.L.C., Calgary Flames Limited Partnership, Gale Force Holdings Limited Partnership, Chicago Blackhawks Hockey Team, Inc., Colorado Avalanche L.L.C., Colhoc Limited Partnership, Dallas Stars L.P., Detroit Red Wings, Inc., Rexall Sports Corp., Florida Panthers Hockey Club Ltd. and Lighting Hockey L.P.
Defendant: Brandon Dubinsky, Shane Prince, Cory Schneider, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, National Hockey League Players' Association, Chris Phillips, John Tavares, Mathieu Darche, Michael Del Zotto, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg, Craig Adams, Ruslan Fedotenko, Manny Malhotra, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Adrian Aucoin, Alex Auld, David Backes, B.J. Crombeen, Kevin Westgarth, Martin Biron, Chris Campoli, Brad Boyes, Shea Weber, Dominic Moore, Steve Montador, Cristobal Nieves, And All those Similarly Situated, Douglas Murray, George Parros, Mark Eaton, Dan Winnik, Ryan McDonagh and Brendan Morrison
Case Number: 1:2012cv09133
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2013 14 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Plaintiffs, Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), hereby notify the Court and all parties that, as Defendants have neither filed an answer nor a motion for summary judgment, Plaintiffs hereby dismiss the above-entitled action without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk of the Court is requested to enter this dismissal in the records of the Court. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/14/2013) (ago)
January 14, 2013 13 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, Without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants. Document filed by All Plaintiffs. (Goldfein, Shepard)
January 7, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/18/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (rjm)
January 7, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER. The Court has received the attached letter from the parties in this case, requesting an adjournment of the conference previously set for Monday, January 7, 2013, in light of their tentative agreement on a new collective bargaining agreement. The conference is adjourned, and rescheduled for Friday, January 18, 2013, at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/7/2013) (rjm)
January 4, 2013 11 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Shepard Goldfein dated 1/4/2013 re: The parties have conferred with each other and agree that an expedited briefing schedule is not necessary and that the normal deadlines set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Court's Local Rules should apply to the Defendants' motion to dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: The Court conference will go forward as scheduled. In light of the parties' joint view that expedited briefing of the motion to dismiss is unnecessary the court intends to set an orderly briefing schedule that does not contemplate the filing of an opposition brief early next week. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/4/2013) (djc) Modified on 1/8/2013 (djc).
January 3, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/7/2013 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. The Court's goal at that conference is to set a schedule and case-management plan for this litigation that is constructive, i.e., one that may enhance, and does not needlessly inhibit, the parties' ability to resolve their disputes with dispatch. The parties are directed to meet and confer on these subjects before the Monday, January 7,2013 conference. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/3/2013) (ft)
January 3, 2013 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Craig Adams, Adrian Aucoin, David Backes, Brad Boyes, Chris Campoli, B.J. Crombeen, Mathieu Darche, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, Ruslan Fedotenko, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, Manny Malhotra, Ryan McDonagh, Steve Montador, Douglas Murray, National Hockey League Players' Association, George Parros, Chris Phillips, Cory Schneider, John Tavares, Shea Weber, Kevin Westgarth, Dan Winnik, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg. (Quinn, James)
January 3, 2013 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by Craig Adams, Adrian Aucoin, David Backes, Brad Boyes, Chris Campoli, B.J. Crombeen, Mathieu Darche, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, Ruslan Fedotenko, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, Manny Malhotra, Ryan McDonagh, Steve Montador, Douglas Murray, National Hockey League Players' Association, George Parros, Chris Phillips, Cory Schneider, John Tavares, Shea Weber, Kevin Westgarth, Dan Winnik, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg.(Quinn, James)
January 3, 2013 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Ryan Gerba on behalf of Craig Adams, Adrian Aucoin, David Backes, Brad Boyes, Chris Campoli, B.J. Crombeen, Mathieu Darche, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, Ruslan Fedotenko, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, Manny Malhotra, Ryan McDonagh, Steve Montador, Douglas Murray, National Hockey League Players' Association, George Parros, Chris Phillips, Cory Schneider, John Tavares, Shea Weber, Kevin Westgarth, Dan Winnik, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg (Gerba, John)
January 3, 2013 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce S. Meyer on behalf of Craig Adams, Adrian Aucoin, David Backes, Brad Boyes, Chris Campoli, B.J. Crombeen, Mathieu Darche, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, Ruslan Fedotenko, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, Manny Malhotra, Ryan McDonagh, Steve Montador, Douglas Murray, National Hockey League Players' Association, George Parros, Chris Phillips, Cory Schneider, John Tavares, Shea Weber, Kevin Westgarth, Dan Winnik, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg (Meyer, Bruce)
January 3, 2013 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James W. Quinn on behalf of Craig Adams, Adrian Aucoin, David Backes, Brad Boyes, Chris Campoli, B.J. Crombeen, Mathieu Darche, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, Ruslan Fedotenko, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, Manny Malhotra, Ryan McDonagh, Steve Montador, Douglas Murray, National Hockey League Players' Association, George Parros, Chris Phillips, Cory Schneider, John Tavares, Shea Weber, Kevin Westgarth, Dan Winnik, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg (Quinn, James)
December 21, 2012 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Consolidated Enterprises, Inc. for Chicago Blackhawks Hockey Team, Inc.; Corporate Parent CBW/SK Sports Ventures II, Inc. for New York Islanders Hockey Club, L.P.; Corporate Parent Winnipeg Jets Hockey Club Inc. for Winnipeg Jets Hockey Club Limited Partnership; Corporate Parent Anschutz L.A. Venture, Inc. for The Los Angeles Kings Hockey Club, L.P.; Corporate Parent KT Sports & Entertainment, Inc. for Gale Force Holdings Limited Partnership. Document filed by Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, L.L.C., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., Calgary Flames Limited Partnership, Capital Sports & Entertainment, Inc., Chicago Blackhawks Hockey Team, Inc., Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Colhoc Limited Partnership, Colorado Avalanche L.L.C., Coyotes Newco, L.L.C., Dallas Stars L.P., Detroit Red Wings, Inc., Florida Panthers Hockey Club Ltd., Gale Force Holdings Limited Partnership, Hockey Western New York, L.L.C., Lighting Hockey L.P., Lincoln Hockey L.L.C., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Minnesota Wild Hockey Club, L.P., Nashville Hockey Club Limited Partnership, National Hockey League, New Jersey Devils, L.L.C., New York Islanders Hockey Club, L.P., Philadelphia Flyers Limited Partnership, Pittsburgh Penguins L.P., Rexall Sports Corp., San Jose Sharks, L.L.C., St. Louis Blues Hockey Club, L.P., The Los Angeles Kings Hockey Club, L.P., The Madison Square Garden Company, Vancouver Canucks Limited Partnership, Winnipeg Jets Hockey Club Limited Partnership.(Goldfein, Shepard)
December 20, 2012 3 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. National Hockey League Players' Association served on 12/17/2012, answer due 1/7/2013. Service was accepted by James W. Quinn, Esq.. Document filed by Philadelphia Flyers Limited Partnership; Coyotes Newco, L.L.C.; Detroit Red Wings, Inc.; Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, L.L.C.; Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc.; Colorado Avalanche L.L.C.; Gale Force Holdings Limited Partnership; Nashville Hockey Club Limited Partnership; Dallas Stars L.P.; Capital Sports & Entertainment, Inc.; San Jose Sharks, L.L.C.; New York Islanders Hockey Club, L.P.; Vancouver Canucks Limited Partnership; Winnipeg Jets Hockey Club Limited Partnership; Calgary Flames Limited Partnership; Colhoc Limited Partnership; Chicago Blackhawks Hockey Team, Inc.; National Hockey League; The Madison Square Garden Company; Minnesota Wild Hockey Club, L.P.; New Jersey Devils, L.L.C.; Lincoln Hockey L.L.C.; Hockey Western New York, L.L.C.; The Los Angeles Kings Hockey Club, L.P.; Rexall Sports Corp.; Florida Panthers Hockey Club Ltd.; Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc. ; St. Louis Blues Hockey Club, L.P.; Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.; Pittsburgh Penguins L.P.; Lighting Hockey L.P.. (Goldfein, Shepard)
December 14, 2012 2 Featured Case STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (laq)
December 14, 2012 Case Designated ECF. (laq)
December 14, 2012 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. (laq)
December 14, 2012 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Craig Adams, And All those Similarly Situated, Adrian Aucoin, Alex Auld, David Backes, Martin Biron, Brad Boyes, Chris Campoli, B.J. Crombeen, Mathieu Darche, Michael Del Zotto, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, Brandon Dubinsky, Mark Eaton, Ruslan Fedotenko, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, Manny Malhotra, Ryan McDonagh, Steve Montador, Dominic Moore, Brendan Morrison, Douglas Murray, National Hockey League Players' Association, New Jersey Devils, L.L.C., Cristobal Nieves, George Parros, Chris Phillips, Shane Prince, Cory Schneider, John Tavares, Shea Weber, Kevin Westgarth, Dan Winnik, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg. (laq)
December 14, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Craig Adams, And All those Similarly Situated, Adrian Aucoin, Alex Auld, David Backes, Martin Biron, Brad Boyes, Chris Campoli, B.J. Crombeen, Mathieu Darche, Michael Del Zotto, Rick Dipietro, Shane Doan, Brandon Dubinsky, Mark Eaton, Ruslan Fedotenko, Alex Goligoski, Ron Hainsey, Scott Hartnell, Jamie Langenbrunner, Manny Malhotra, Ryan McDonagh, Steve Montador, Dominic Moore, Brendan Morrison, Douglas Murray, National Hockey League Players' Association, New Jersey Devils, L.L.C., Cristobal Nieves, George Parros, Chris Phillips, Shane Prince, Cory Schneider, John Tavares, Shea Weber, Kevin Westgarth, Dan Winnik, James Wisniewski, Henrik Zetterberg. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1055402)Document filed by Philadelphia Flyers Limited Partnership, Coyotes Newco, L.L.C., Detroit Red Wings, Inc., Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, L.L.C., Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc., Colorado Avalanche L.L.C., Gale Force Holdings Limited Partnership, Nashville Hockey Club Limited Partnership, Capital Sports & Entertainment, Inc., San Jose Sharks, L.L.C., New York Islanders Hockey Club, L.P., Vancouver Canucks Limited Partnership, Winnipeg Jets Hockey Club Limited Partnership, Calgary Flames Limited Partnership, Colhoc Limited Partnership, Chicago Blackhawks Hockey Team, Inc., National Hockey League, The Madison Square Garden Company, Minnesota Wild Hockey Club, L.P., Lincoln Hockey L.L.C., Hockey Western New York, L.L.C., The Los Angeles Kings Hockey Club, L.P., Rexall Sports Corp., Florida Panthers Hockey Club Ltd., Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc., St. Louis Blues Hockey Club, L.P., Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd., Pittsburgh Penguins L.P., Lighting Hockey L.P..(laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Hockey League et al v. National Hockey League Players' Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lincoln Hockey L.L.C.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Jose Sharks, L.L.C.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis Blues Hockey Club, L.P.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winnipeg Jets Hockey Club Limited Partnership
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pittsburgh Penguins L.P.
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maple Leaf Sports & Entertainment Ltd.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vancouver Canucks Limited Partnership
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Club De Hockey Canadien, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nashville Hockey Club Limited Partnership
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jersey Devils, L.L.C.
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Islanders Hockey Club, L.P.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Madison Square Garden Company
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Sports & Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Flyers Limited Partnership
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coyotes Newco, L.L.C.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Los Angeles Kings Hockey Club, L.P.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Wild Hockey Club, L.P.
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Hockey League
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anaheim Ducks Hockey Club, L.L.C.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boston Professional Hockey Association, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hockey Western New York, L.L.C.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calgary Flames Limited Partnership
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gale Force Holdings Limited Partnership
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chicago Blackhawks Hockey Team, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Avalanche L.L.C.
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colhoc Limited Partnership
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Stars L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Detroit Red Wings, Inc.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rexall Sports Corp.
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Panthers Hockey Club Ltd.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighting Hockey L.P.
Represented By: Elliot Adam Silver
Represented By: Matthew Michael Martino
Represented By: James A. Keyte
Represented By: Shepard Goldfein
Represented By: Paul Madison Eckles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Dubinsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Prince
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cory Schneider
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hartnell
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Langenbrunner
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Hockey League Players' Association
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Phillips
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Tavares
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathieu Darche
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Del Zotto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Dipietro
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Doan
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wisniewski
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrik Zetterberg
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Adams
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruslan Fedotenko
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manny Malhotra
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Goligoski
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Hainsey
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Aucoin
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Auld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Backes
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.J. Crombeen
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Westgarth
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Biron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Campoli
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Boyes
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shea Weber
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominic Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Montador
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cristobal Nieves
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And All those Similarly Situated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Murray
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Parros
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Eaton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Winnik
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McDonagh
Represented By: James W. Quinn
Represented By: Bruce S. Meyer
Represented By: John Ryan Gerba
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brendan Morrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]