Keren Matana v. Merkin et al

Defendant: Gabriel Capital Corporation and J. Ezra Merkin
Plaintiff: Keren Matana
Case Number: 1:2013cv01534
Filed: March 7, 2013
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of U.S.
Presiding Judge: Paul A. Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & OPINION: Defendants' motion to dismiss the Complaint is granted. Plaintiff's motion to strike is granted in part, and denied in part. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend its holder claim and its breach of implied contractual du ty claim. If plaintiff wishes to file an Amended Complaint, it must do so no later than August 20, 2013. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motions pending at docket numbers 12 and 15. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/30/2013) (djc) Modified on 7/31/2013 (djc).
August 6, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER re: 43 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 Memorandum & Opinion, dismissing complaint with right to replead two claims. filed by Keren Matana. KM's motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket number 43. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/6/2013) (djc) Modified on 8/6/2013 (djc).
November 22, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER re: 52 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Gabriel Capital Corporation, J. Ezra Merkin. For the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at docket number 52, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/22/2013) (lmb)
February 4, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER re: 71 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 67 Memorandum & Opinion, dismissing Amended Complaint and Closing Case. filed by Keren Matana. KM's motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at docket number 71, and to close this case. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/3/2014) (djc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keren Matana v. Merkin et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Capital Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Ezra Merkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keren Matana
Represented By: David Edgar Bamberger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]