Moses v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Anthony Moses
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv02041
Filed: March 26, 2013
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Bronx
Referring Judge: James C. Francis
Presiding Judge: Lorna G. Schofield
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Rev. of Final Dec. of Sec. of HEW re: S.S. Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Commissioner of Social Security, 2 Complaint filed by Anthony Moses. For the reasons set forth above, I recommend that the defendant's motion (Docket no. 12) be granted and the complaint be dismissed. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) and Rules 72, 6(a), and 6{d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties shall have fourteen (14) days to file written objections to this report and reco mmendation. Such objections shall be filed with the Clerk of the Court, with extra copies delivered to the Honorable Lorna G. Schofield, Room 201, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007, and to the chambers of the undersigned, Room 1960, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. Failure to file timely objections will preclude appellate review. Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2013 (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 10/17/2013) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (ja)
November 15, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Commissioner of Social Security.The Court ADOPTS the Report in its entirety as the decision of the Court. This case is DISMISSED. A certificate of appealability shall not issue, as Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to the pro se Plaintiff and close this case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/15/2013) (lmb) Modified on 11/15/2013 (lmb).
February 25, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Finding no clear error in the Second Report, and for the reasons stated above, the Court adopts the Second Report in its entirety. Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time to file a notice of appeal is hereby DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at docket 24 and close this case. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/25/2014) (cd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moses v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Moses
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]