United States of America v. United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc., Palonia Development & Preservation Services Co., LLC and First Sealord Surety, Inc.
Cross_claimant: Palonia Development & Preservation Services Co., LLC, United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc. and First Sealord Surety, Inc.
Cross_defendant: United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc. and Palonia Development & Preservation Services Co., LLC
Case Number: 7:2011cv00730
Filed: February 2, 2011
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: White Plains Office
County: Dutchess
Presiding Judge: Cathy Seibel
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 13, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Before the Court is the Report and Recommendation ("R&R") of Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis, dated April 22, 2013, (Doc. 47), recommending that the cross-claim of Defendant United States Environ mental Universal Services, Inc. ("USEUS") be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. No objections to the R&R have been filed, so I review it for clear error. No error, clear or otherwise, being apparent, the R&R is hereby adopted as the decision of the Court, and the cross-claim of USEUS is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 5/13/2013) (lnl)
November 20, 2013 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Before the Court is the Report and Recommendation ("R&R") of Magistrate Judge George A. Yanthis, dated October 30, 2013, (Doc. 61), recommending that a judgment of default be entered against Defenda nt Palonia Development & Restoration Services Co., LLC ("Palonia"). No objections to the R&R have been filed, so I review it for clear error. No error clear or otherwise being apparent, the R&R is hereby adopted as the decision of the Court . Defendant Palonia is hereby declared in default, and a default judgment will be entered against it in an amount to be determined after an inquest. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to re-designate this matter to Magistrate Judge Davison, to whom the undersigned will refer the case for an inquest as to damages for both Defendant Palonia and Defendant United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc. (See Docs. 57, 60.) (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 11/20/2013) (lnl)
September 2, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Before the Court is the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison dated July 15, 2014 (the "R&R"). (Doc. 71.) No objections have been received. I have reviewed the R&R for cl ear error and find none. Accordingly, the R&R is hereby adopted as the decision of the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment against Defendant Palonia Development & Preservation Services Co. LLC ("Palonia" ), and in favor of Plaintiff National Development & Construction Corp., ("NDC"), on NDC's breach of contract claim against Palonia, in the principal amount of $120,000.00, plus prejudgment interest in the amount of $48,70 4.74, plus additional prejudgment interest at the rate of $29.59 per day from July 15, 2014 until the date judgment is entered. All other claims having been disposed of (save those against First Sealord Surety, Inc., which was liquidated by the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania in or about March 2012), the Clerk of Court is also respectfully directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 9/2/2014) (lnl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Bradley Maclean Wilson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palonia Development & Preservation Services Co., LLC
Represented By: Michael John Matsler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Sealord Surety, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Palonia Development & Preservation Services Co., LLC
Represented By: Michael John Matsler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: First Sealord Surety, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: United States Environmental Universal Services, Inc.
Represented By: Henry Chan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Palonia Development & Preservation Services Co., LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]