Prebul et al v. Bensusan et al

In_re: Joseph Prebul
Appellee: Alliance Investments Group, LLC, 117 Seventh Avenue South Property Co., L.P., TSE Group, LLC, Danny Bensusan, DBS International, LLC, Gary D Chazen and Steven Bensusan
Appellant: James R Paris, Joseph Prebul, Prebul Chrysler Jeep Dodge, LLC and Carolex, LLC
Case Number: 1:2011cv00214
Filed: August 17, 2011
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM with order to follow;Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/20/2012. (AWH, )
November 13, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM with order to follow; Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/13/2012. (AWH, ) Modified on 11/13/2012 (AWH, ).Duplicate order see cf # 24
November 30, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM with order to follow;Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 11/30/2012. (AWH, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prebul et al v. Bensusan et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: Joseph Prebul
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alliance Investments Group, LLC
Represented By: Austin L McMullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: 117 Seventh Avenue South Property Co., L.P.
Represented By: Austin L McMullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: TSE Group, LLC
Represented By: Austin L McMullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Danny Bensusan
Represented By: Austin L McMullen
Represented By: Matthew D Sobolewski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DBS International, LLC
Represented By: Austin L McMullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gary D Chazen
Represented By: Nicholas W Whittenburg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Steven Bensusan
Represented By: Austin L McMullen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James R Paris
Represented By: Christopher T Varner
Represented By: James A Fields
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joseph Prebul
Represented By: Christopher T Varner
Represented By: Thomas E Ray
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Prebul Chrysler Jeep Dodge, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T Varner
Represented By: James A Fields
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carolex, LLC
Represented By: Christopher T Varner
Represented By: James A Fields
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]