Guthrie v. Ball et al

Defendant: Gregory Ball and Melissa Rodgers
Plaintiff: Karen Guthrie
Case Number: 1:2011cv00333
Filed: November 14, 2011
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Presiding Judge: Harry S Mattice
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 3, 2014 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting, without objection, 88 Motion in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence that Donald Guthrie Ever Took Recreational Drugs During His Lifetime. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/3/2014. (BJL, ) Modified on 10/3/2014 (BJL,).***Mailed to Attorney John Pate.
October 8, 2014 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 106 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 8, 2014. (CNC, ) Mailed to John W. Pate (CNC, ).
October 8, 2014 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 97 Motion in Limine; granting 114 Motion in Limine; granting 140 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 8, 2014. On or before Thursday, October 9, 2014, no later than 5:00 p.m. [EASTERN], each party is DIRECTED to file a list designating up to three expert witnesses whom the party expects to call to testify at trial. (CNC) Mailed to John W. Pate (CNC)
October 8, 2014 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 107 Motion in Limine; granting 113 Motion in Limine. The aspects of the motions pertaining to expert testimony [Doc. 107 & 113] are GRANTED and Plaintiff is precluded from attempting to introduce expert testimon y about such matters. Any other issues alluded to in the motions or responses will need to be addressed by asserting evidentiary objections at trial, if necessary.Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 8, 2014. (CNC, ) Mailed to John W. Pate(CNC, ).
October 8, 2014 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Motion in Limine and 101 Response/Cross-motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 8, 2014. (CNC, ) Mailed to John W. Pate (CNC)
October 8, 2014 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion in Limine as follows: the request to trifurcate the trial is DENIED and the request to bifurcate the trial is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 8, 2014. (CNC, ) Mailed to John W. Pate(CNC, ).
October 8, 2014 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 8, 2014. (CNC, ) Mailed to John W. Pate (CNC)
October 9, 2014 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 124 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 9, 2014. (CNC, )
October 9, 2014 209 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 9, 2014. (CNC, )
October 10, 2014 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 9, 2014. (CNC, )
October 10, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on October 9, 2014. (CNC, )
October 14, 2014 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Accordingly, motion in limine No. 16 is granted and to the extent there were any life insurance proceeds, mention or evidence of same is precluded at trial;Motion in Limine No. 17 is Denied; motion in limine No. 18 is gr anted and will apply equally to both parties; motion in limine No. 19 is granted and will apply equally to both parties; motion in limine No. 20 is granted;Motion in Limine 21 is Denied within reason; motion in limine No. 22 is granted and will ap ply equally to both parties; motion in limine No. 23 is granted; motion in limine No. 24 is granted; motion in limine No. 25 is granted and will apply equally to both parties; motion in limine No. 26 is granted; Motion in Limine No. 27 is Granted, but only to the extent Plaintiff was not a party to the lawsuit. motion in limine No. 28 is granted; Motion in Limine #29 Granted again (see No. 24); Motion in limine No. 30 Granted without objection and will apply equally to all parties (see #17) m otion in limine No. 31 is granted; motion in limine No. 32 is granted and will apply equally to both parties; and motion in limine No. 33 is granted.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/14/2014. (BJL, ) Modified on 10/14/2014 (BJL, ).
October 14, 2014 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 125 " Motion in Limine #15 To Exclude Testimony on Pain and Suffering. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/14/2014. (BJL, ) Modified on 10/15/2014 (BJL, ).
October 14, 2014 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion in Limine Motion in Limine #25 to Exclude Reference to Dr. Balls Attendance of Medical School in Granada, West Indies as set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/14/2014. (BJL, )
October 14, 2014 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 132 " Motion in Limine #18 to Exclude to Exclude Any Argument, Testimony, or Other Evidence Regarding Plaintiffs Claim for Punitive Damages or That Defendant Acted Intentionally [sic], Maliciously, Fraudulently, Or Recklessly." Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/14/2014. (BJL, ) Modified on 10/15/2014 (BJL, ).
October 17, 2014 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 137 "Motion in Limine #23 to Exclude FDA Alert from Evidence at Trial." Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/17/2014. (BJL, )
October 17, 2014 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 134 " Motion in Limine #20 to Exclude Any Reference to Any Prior Lawsuits Involving Defendants [sic]." In addition, the parties are precluded from questioning opposing experts about any prior malpractice suits that did not result in a judgment, by agreement of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/17/2014. (BJL, )
October 17, 2014 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 138 Motion in Limine #24 to Exclude Any Reference to Pain Management Guidelines. The Court will RESERVE RULING as to whether the 2008 and 2009 pain management guidelines are admissible. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/17/2014. (BJL, )
May 17, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 5/16/12. (GRE, )
July 5, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 7/5/12. (GRE, )
September 17, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 9/17/12. (GRE, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthrie v. Ball et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Ball
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Rodgers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Guthrie
Represented By: Christopher A Keith
Represented By: Christopher A Keith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]