Dunn v. Chattanooga Publishing Company

Plaintiff: Debra Dunn
Defendant: Chattanooga Publishing Company
Case Number: 1:2012cv00252
Filed: July 24, 2012
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Referring Judge: Susan K Lee
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 14, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM with order to follow; Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/14/2013. (AWH, )
February 14, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM with order to follow.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 2/14/2013. (AWH, )
January 8, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM with order to follow.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/8/2014. (AWH, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Chattanooga Publishing Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Dunn
Represented By: Frank P Pinchak
Represented By: Harry F Burnette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattanooga Publishing Company
Represented By: Rosemarie L Hill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]