Reynolds v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of

Plaintiff: William C Reynolds
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Case Number: 1:2012cv00396
Filed: December 3, 2012
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Chattanooga Office
County: Hamilton
Referring Judge: William B Carter
Presiding Judge: Curtis L Collier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, 13 First MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by William C Reynolds Signed by Magistrate Judge William B Carter on 1/3/2014. (DJH, )
January 22, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying Defendant's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment; accepting and adopting Magistrate Judge William B. Carter's 19 Repo rt and Recommendations. The Commissioner's decision denying benefits to Plaintiff is REVERSED and REMANDED pursuant to Sentence Four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for action consistent with the R&R. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/22/2013. ENTERED AS A JUDGMENT by Debra C. Poplin, CLERK OF COURT. (BJL, )
March 28, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Attorney Fees and AWARDS Plaintiff a total amount of $2,952.18 to be paid in a manner consistent with 28 U.S.C. § 2412.; adopting Report and Recommendations re 25 Report and Recommendations. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/28/2014. (DJH, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C Reynolds
Represented By: Michael R Buchanan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]