Booker v. Lapaglia et al
Plaintiff: |
Felix Charles Booker |
Defendant: |
Daniel R Steakley, Jerry Shelton, Michael A Lapaglia, MD, Methodist Medical Center of Oak Ridge, Team Health, Inc., Southeastern Emergency Physicians, Inc., Tammy Jones, Paul White, David Beams, City of Oak Ridge, Tennessee, Anderson County, Tennessee and Lewis Ridenour |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00126 |
Filed: |
March 16, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee |
Office: |
Knoxville Office |
County: |
Anderson |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas W Phillips |
Presiding Judge: |
C Clifford Shirley |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2014 |
Filing
282
Memorandum Opinion and Order; denying Mr. Booker's motion for reconsideration, 156 ; denying Dr. LaPaglia and Methodist's motions to strike 250 and 251 ; granting Methodist's motion for leave to supplement its response 252 ; Officer Ridenour's motion for summary judgment, 135 , is granted in part with respect to claims for any actions leading up to the hospital visit, and denied in part with respect to Mr. Booker's claims relating to the hosp ital visit; Officer Steakley and Oak Ridge's joint motion for summary judgment, 144 , is granted in part with respect to claims for any actions leading up to the hospital visit, and denied in part with respect to any remaining claims; Deputy S helton and Anderson County's joint motion for summary judgment, 172 , is granted in part with respect to claims for any actions leading up to the hospital visit, and denied in part with respect to Mr. Bookers remaining claims; denying Dr. La Paglia's motion for summary judgment 164 ; denying as moot Tammy Jones and Methodist Medical Center's joint motion for summary judgment 137 ; denying 153 Mr. Booker's motion for summary judgment; dismissing Mr. Booker's § ; 1983 claims for actions leading up to the hospital visit; dismissing Mr. Booker's state law claims for false arrest and imprisonment as well as malicious prosecution; and remanding Mr. Booker's remaining state law claims to the Circuit Court of Anderson County, Tennessee. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 8/28/14. (ADA)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing
129
ORDER granting 120 the Motion for Clarification. The Court hereby CLARIFIES its previous Orders 54 97 , by stating this case is STAYED IN ITS ENTIRETY, pending decision by the Court of Appeals. Thus, all discovery and pretrial deadlines are STAYED. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on August 8, 2013. (AYB)
|
October 30, 2012 |
Filing
97
ORDER whereby the several motions for summary judgment 25 32 57 66 69 86 and 88 are all GRANTED IN PART and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART. The court dismisses Daniel Beams and Paul White from this action, and holds that any federal claims against Methodist Medical Center, Southeastern, Team Health, and Nurse Jones are also dismissed. The court further dismisses any claims for violations of the Tennessee Constitution and dismisses the claims against Dr. LaPaglia and Nurse Jones for violations of Tenn. Code Ann. § 29-20-101. The remaining claims in this case are stayed pending the resolution of Mr. Booker's appeal in his criminal case that is currently before the Sixth Circuit. At that time, any pa rty may renew its arguments that the court here denies without prejudice by filing an appropriate motion. Dr. LaPaglia has filed a motion for leave to supplement his motion for summary judgment 91 . Nurse Jones and Methodist Medical Center have file d a similar motion 95 . These motions are DENIED AS MOOT, as is Mr. Booker's motion for permission to file an unsigned affidavit 79 . Finally, the court GRANTS the motion of Nurse Jones and Methodist Medical Center to file an amended answer. The court orders the parties to submit a notice when the Sixth Circuit has issued its opinion. At that time, the court will set the matter down for a scheduling conference. Signed by District Judge Tena Campbell on October 29, 2012. (AYB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Tennessee Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Booker v. Lapaglia et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Daniel R Steakley |
Represented By: |
Benjamin K Lauderback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jerry Shelton |
Represented By: |
Arthur F Knight, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Michael A Lapaglia, MD |
Represented By: |
James G O'Kane |
Represented By: |
Raymond G LeWallen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Methodist Medical Center of Oak Ridge |
Represented By: |
Rachel Park Hurt |
Represented By: |
F Michael Fitzpatrick |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Team Health, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jason H Long |
Represented By: |
Heidi A Barcus |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Southeastern Emergency Physicians, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jason H Long |
Represented By: |
Heidi A Barcus |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Tammy Jones |
Represented By: |
Rachel Park Hurt |
Represented By: |
F Michael Fitzpatrick |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Paul White |
Represented By: |
Arthur F Knight, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: David Beams |
Represented By: |
Benjamin K Lauderback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: City of Oak Ridge, Tennessee |
Represented By: |
Benjamin K Lauderback |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Anderson County, Tennessee |
Represented By: |
Arthur F Knight, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Lewis Ridenour |
Represented By: |
Daniel H Rader, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Felix Charles Booker |
Represented By: |
Robert L Jolley, Jr |
Represented By: |
R. Arthur Jenkins |
Represented By: |
Peter J Alliman, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?