LNV Corporation v. Gebhardt (TV3)

Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Defendant: Catherine Gebhardt
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00468
Filed: September 5, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Sevier
Referring Judge: H Bruce Guyton
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 24 Motion to Seal Document, and the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to place Document 1-1 and Document 10-2 under seal. In the future, the parties are to redact information under Rule 5.2 rather than asking that entire documents be sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 10/18/2013. (KMK, ) Modified on 10/18/2013: copy mailed (KMK, ).
November 1, 2013 31 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 17 Motion to Proceed Pro Se, Affidavit in Support of Continuance & Motion for Permission to Seek Affirmative Relief and granting 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mr. Taylor is RELIEVED of his duties as counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 11/01/2013. (KAW) (c/m to Catherine Gebhardt.)
March 18, 2014 53 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND OPINION as set forth in following order. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/18/14. (c/m to Ms. Gebhardt)(ABF)
May 28, 2014 71 Featured Case ORDER denying 64 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge H Bruce Guyton on 5/28/14. (copy mailed) (KMK, )
June 16, 2014 91 Featured Case ORDER that defendants motions to recuse 84 , 85 and 90 and motion to reconsider 65 are hereby DENIED. The proposed intervenors motions to intervene 72 , 73 and 74 and motion for relief from judgment 75 are also hereby DENIED. The Court notes that the proposed intervenors filed several motions for judicial notice [Docs. 76, 77, 78, 79, 80], and plaintiff requested additional time to respond to these and other motions 82 . In light of the Courts previous findings, all of these motions are hereby DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/16/14. (c/m) (ABF)
June 24, 2014 97 Featured Case ORDER that the Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the R&R 70 , plaintiffs Motion for Award of Attorney Fees 57 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, and plaintiff is hereby awarded $35,627.36, representing the attorneys fees and costs reasonably incurred in this matter. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/24/14. (c/m) (ABF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: LNV Corporation v. Gebhardt (TV3)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Represented By: Ronald G Steen, Jr
Represented By: Kevin P Hartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Gebhardt
Represented By: Douglas E Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]