Layman v. Stuart Allen & Associates, Inc.

Defendant: Stuart Allen & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greg Greg Layman
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00155
Filed: March 19, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Sevier
Presiding Judge: Karen K Caldwell
Referring Judge: C Clifford Shirley
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting aside 7 the Court's Order of June 7, 2013; granting 8 Plaintiff's MOTION for a Four-Day Extension of Time to the extent that Plaintiff's amended complaint 9 in response to the Court's show cause order will be considered timely; and Defendant will have until July 2, 2013, to respond to the amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Karen K Caldwell on June 12, 2013. (mailed to Mr. Layman) (AYB)
April 4, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: 23 Motion for Summary Judgment - Signed by District Judge Karen K Caldwell on 4/04/2014. (KMK, )
June 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's complaint is STRICKEN and the action DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Karen K Caldwell on June 7, 2013. (mailed to Mr. Layman) (AYB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Layman v. Stuart Allen & Associates, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Allen & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Tara Lyn Dalton
Represented By: R Dale Bay
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Greg Layman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]