Lowell et al v. Summer Bay Management, L.C. et al (TV3)

Plaintiff: Jennifer Deal, Patricia K Watts, Claude N Ledgerwood, III, Bonita Ledgerwood, Eric Jiminez, Bryan Wayne Bleckley, Jeanne Elizabeth Bleckley, Laura Terrell Sasser, Marc Anthony Sasser, Larry P Lowell, Jr and Nancy Jane Lowell
Defendant: Summer Bay Management, L.C., Summer Bay Partnership and Joe H Scott, Sr
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00229
Filed: April 22, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Eastern District Court
Office: Knoxville Office
County: Knox
Presiding Judge: Thomas A Varlan
Referring Judge: C Clifford Shirley
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Joint Motion to Stay. Based upon the parties agreement and the Courts Order, the discovery and briefing schedule for the Motion to Certify Class 18 is as follows:1. Discovery on Clas s Certification shall be completed on or before December 6, 2013;2. Plaintiffs supplemental brief in support of the Motion to Certify Class shall be filed on or before December 13, 2013;3. Defendants response shall be filed on or before January 10, 2 014;4. Plaintiffs shall file their final reply on or before January 17, 2014; and5. The parties shall appear before the undersigned for a hearing on the Motion to Certify Class at 9:30 a.m. on January 29, 2014.Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on 09/24/2013. (KAW)
March 17, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court ACCEPTS IN WHOLE the R&R 40 . Therefore, Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 18 is GRANTED and the proposed class is hereby certified as a class action. Accordingly, it is ORDERED as follows: 1. attorn eys Christopher T. Cain, Thomas S. Scott, Jr., of Scott & Cain, and W. Allen McDonald, of Lacy, Price & Wagner, P.C. are hereby APPOINTED as class counsel; 2. Defendants shall provide any records it may have evidencing thenames and addresses of poten tial class members to class counsel within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order; and 3. Class counsel shall send notice of this action to potential class members, pursuant to Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, within ninety (90) days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 3/17/14. (ABF)
May 7, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 47 Motion for Approval of Form and Plan of Notice to Class Member of Certification of Class Action. Consistent with the Court's previous Orders [Docs. 43 & 52 ], the Plaintiffs shall mail the proposed notices on or before June 23, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge C Clifford Shirley, Jr on May 7, 2014. (RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lowell et al v. Summer Bay Management, L.C. et al (TV3)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Deal
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia K Watts
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claude N Ledgerwood, III
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita Ledgerwood
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Jiminez
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Wayne Bleckley
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeanne Elizabeth Bleckley
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Terrell Sasser
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Anthony Sasser
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry P Lowell, Jr
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Jane Lowell
Represented By: Thomas S Scott, Jr
Represented By: W. Allen McDonald
Represented By: Chris T Cain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Bay Management, L.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey R Murrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Bay Partnership
Represented By: Jeffrey R Murrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe H Scott, Sr
Represented By: Jeffrey R Murrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]