Pilkinton v. Hartsfield et al

Plaintiff: John Pilkinton
Defendant: David M. Hartsfield, Morris E. Ezell and Bridgnorth Partners
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00026
Filed: March 8, 2012
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Maury
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 24 Featured Case ORDER: For all of the reasons discussed herein, the Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Admissions (Docket No. 17 ) is GRANTED. However, the defendants are hereby ORDERED to serve supplemental responses to request numbers 13 and 15 in the plainti ff's requests for admissions by May 17, 2013. The court shall hold its consideration of the plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment in abeyance pending the plaintiff's receipt of the supplemental responses. The defendants are also ORDERED to file their supplemental responses with the court by May 17, 2013. It is so Ordered. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/9/2013. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
June 3, 2013 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM. An appropriate order will enter. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
June 3, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER: For the reasons expressed in the accompanying Memorandum, the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 14 is GRANTED. The plaintiff shall file, by June 14, 2013, an affidavit setting forth a revised figure reflecting the total sum of p rincipal and interest he seeks to recover under the note in question. The defendants shall file any objection to the amount claimed by the plaintiff by June 21, 2013, after which the court will enter its judgment. It is so Ordered. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
July 2, 2013 32 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Based on the foregoing, the plaintiff is hereby AWARDED damages in the sum of $105,026.72. Entry of this order shall constitute the judgment in this case. It is so Ordered. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/2/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
March 4, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion for Charging Order. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 3/4/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Pilkinton v. Hartsfield et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Pilkinton
Represented By: Paul J. Krog
Represented By: Eugene N. Bulso, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Hartsfield
Represented By: Thomas J. Wolaver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris E. Ezell
Represented By: Thomas J. Wolaver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgnorth Partners
Represented By: Thomas J. Wolaver
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]