Lewis et al v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Linda Lewis and Bruce Lewis
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00043
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Maury
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
 
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1: Discovery due by 9/5/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 10/24/2014. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2015 before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 2/25/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 2, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Linda Lewis. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 9/2/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 2, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is re-set for 8/19/2013 at 2:00 PM in Columbia before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 7/2/13. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lewis
Represented By: Amy L. Bennecoff
Represented By: Michael J. McNulty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Lewis
Represented By: Michael J. McNulty
Represented By: Amy L. Bennecoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]