Poarch v. Fritz et al

Defendant: Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Jacob Fritz
Plaintiff: Lewis Poarch
 
Case Number: 1:2014cv00069
Filed: June 2, 2014
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Columbia Office
County: Marshall
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2014 10 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1: The Jury Trial is set for 11/17/2015 at 9:00 AM and the Pretrial Conference is set for 11/2/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Discovery due by 5/28/2015. Motions due by 6/30/2015. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for all other deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. on 8/18/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
September 2, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 2: Jury Trial set for 11/17/2015 at 9:00 AM and Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/23/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. on 9/2/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)
August 1, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING HEARING: The Case Management Conference set in this action for Monday, August 25, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. is RESET for Monday, August 18, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. in the United States Courthouse in Columbia, Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr. on 7/31/2014. (ds)
August 8, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER of Dismissal as to the uninsured motorist carrier, Safeway Insurance Company. IT IS ORDERED the Complaint in this cause be and is hereby dismissed - without prejudice - to the Plaintiff as it pertains to SW, the uninsured/underinsured carrier of Plaintiff, and any court costs in this cause against SW, if any, shall be assessed at a later date, by further order of this court. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 8/8/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Poarch v. Fritz et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakley Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Fritz
Represented By: John Thomas Feeney, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Poarch
Represented By: Blair Pierson Durham
Represented By: Bart C. Durham, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]