USA v. $164705 US Currency, et al

 
Case Number: 3:2004cv00270
Filed: March 31, 2004
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Robert Echols
 
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Telephone Conference held on 2/22/2011. Discovery due by 3/25/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 4/11/2011. A final, dispositive, nonjury evidentiary hearing is set for 10/25/2011 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. The Magistrate J udge will conduct a final pretrial conference set for 10/13/2011 at 1:00 PM before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Each party shall submit a prehearing conference order one week prior to the conference, which shall succinctly state the issues and co ntentions of the parties. The Claimant is to inform the Court at least 30 days prior to the hearing date what witnesses other than himself, if any, he desires to call at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/24/11. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)
September 28, 2011 184 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION:For the reasons stated above, the undersigned RECOMMENDS that both Motions for Summary Judgment be DENIED. Under Rule 72(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, any party has fourteen (14) days from receipt of this Repor t and Recommendation within which to file with the District Court any written objections to the proposed findings and recommendations made herein. Any party opposing shall have fourteen (14) days from receipt of any objections filed regarding this Re port within which to file a response to said objections. Failure to file specific objections within fourteen (14) days of receipt of this Report and Recommendation may constitute a waiver of further appeal of this Recommendation. Thomas v. Arn, 474 U.S. 140, reh'g denied, 474 U.S. 1111 (1986). ENTERED this 28th day of September, 2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 9/28/2011. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)
November 3, 2011 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/3/2011. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(eh)
June 14, 2013 358 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The Report and Recommendation (Docket No. 329 ) is ACCEPTED and made the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this court. For the reasons expressed therein, it is hereby ORDERED that the currency in the amount of $1 64,705 and the currency in the amount of $19,000 are hereby FORFEITED to the United States of America, and the $4,300 shall be returned to the claimant as not forfeitable. It is so ORDERED. Enter this 14th day of June 2013. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/14/2013. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: USA v. $164705 US Currency, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]