Moore et al v. Weinstein Company, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Samuel David Moore, Joyce Ellen Moore and SJM Trust, The
Defendant: Weinstein Company, LLC, The, MGM Studios, Inc., Genius Products, LLC, Concord Music Group, Inc., Harvey Weinstein and Bob Weinstein
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00166
Filed: February 17, 2009
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Trademark Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: Joe Brown
Presiding Judge: Robert Echols
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1121 Trademark Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Upon reassignment of this case to Judge Trauger, it is hereby ORDERED that the reference to Magistrate Judge Brown is WITHDRAWN. Judge Magistrate Judge Joe Brown no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/7/10. (dt)
November 12, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the Notice of Bankruptcy Filing By Defendant Metro-Goldwyn-Mayer Studios, Inc. 144 , it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in this case as to this defendant only are STAYED pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/12/10. (dt)
February 8, 2011 160 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Pltfs' 152 Motion for Leave to Amend in Support of Amended Complaint is GRANTED. The 146 Complaint filed on 12/17/10 is hereby deemed the operative Complaint in this case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 2/8/11. (rd)
February 28, 2011 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 158 Motion to Deem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/28/11. (af)
July 12, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Deft's 194 Motion for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Norman Lear is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 7/12/11. (rd)
August 3, 2011 247 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons expressed within, defts' 202 Motion to Compel is GRANTED, and its motion for fees is also GRANTED. Defts should submit a request for reasonable fees within 28 days of this order. Pltf will have 14 days to object. There will be no reply unless requested by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 8/3/11. (rd)
February 2, 2012 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth below, Defendants' Application for Fees 255 is GRANTED in part, and their Motion for Sanctions 259 is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to pay Defendants' reasonable attorneys fees of $17,513. 50 for their discovery abuses. With regard to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions, the Magistrate Judge believes Defendants should be entitled to an adverse inference with regard to Plaintiffs' claim that they received income from the intellec tual property asserted in the lawsuit and RECOMMENDS that the trial judge implement this remedy. The Magistrate Judge also RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs be precluded from relying on documents not produced as of the date of this Order and from relying on any electronically stored information ("ESI") not produced as of the date of this Order. For these reasons, the Magistrate Judge believes the penalties above are appropriate and necessary. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/2/12. (tmw)
February 3, 2012 324 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth below, Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend is DENIED, and Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 2/3/12. (tmw)
May 11, 2012 373 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/11/12. (rd)
May 23, 2012 375 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM: An appropriate order will enter. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/23/12. (tmw)
May 23, 2012 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the court finds as follows: (See Order for details). All claims by the plaintiffs are hereby DISMISSED. Entry of this order constitutes judgment in the case. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/23/12. (tmw)
December 18, 2012 402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the foregoing, Defendants' costs are properly taxed to Plaintiffs at $52,728.67. The Magistrate Judge has issued this in the form of an Order. In the event Judge Trauger determines this should be more properly be deemed a Report and Recommendation, she may of course address it under that standard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 12/18/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
January 25, 2013 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 405 Motion to Strike Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Magistrate Brown's Action on Costs. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
August 25, 2014 418 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/25/2014. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(eh)
August 25, 2014 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum, the Magistrate Judge's December 18, 2012 Report & Recommendation (Docket No. 402 ) is ACCEPTED IN PART and REJECTED IN PART. The Clerk's original taxation of costs (Docket No. 383) is hereby VACATED. The Clerk is hereby directed to tax costs against the plaintiffs in the amount of $18,396.18. It is so ORDERED. Enter this 25th day of August 2014. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/25/2014. (eh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Moore et al v. Weinstein Company, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel David Moore
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Ellen Moore
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SJM Trust, The
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weinstein Company, LLC, The
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Studios, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genius Products, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concord Music Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey Weinstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Weinstein
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]