Ingram Barge Company v. Century Aluminum of West Virginia, Inc.

Plaintiff: Ingram Barge Company
Defendant: Century Aluminum of West Virginia, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2010cv00110
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Marine Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2012 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/10/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (rd)
June 22, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Parties shall file an amended joint mediation report by 6/27/2011 that sets a more realistic deadline for conducting a mediation in this case. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 6/22/11. (dt)
January 9, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines 55 is Granted. Discovery due by 2/20/2012, and the deadline for the completion of mediation shall be 3/20/2012. A new dispositive motion deadline and trial date will be set following the mediation, if the case does not settle in mediation. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 1/9/12. (dt)
May 7, 2012 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 69 Motion for Leave to Exceed Briefing Page Limit. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/7/2012. (eh)
August 1, 2012 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 8/2/12. (rd) Modified on 8/2/2012 (af).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram Barge Company v. Century Aluminum of West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingram Barge Company
Represented By: Caldwell G. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Century Aluminum of West Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.