New Hampshire Insurance Co. v. Blackjack Cove, LLC et al

Plaintiff: New Hampshire Insurance Co.
Defendant: Blackjack Cove, LLC and Commerce Union Bank
Case Number: 3:2010cv00607
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that the documents sought in the subpoena constitute work product, and that Plaintiff has not waived that work product protection. Therefore, the instant "Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Quash" 49 is GRANTED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/31/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
January 31, 2013 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, and for Plaintiff's failure to comply with Local Rule 7.01(a), the instant Motion to Compel 54 is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 1/31/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
June 25, 2013 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Jury Trial set for 8/20/2013 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2013 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Kevin H. Sharp. Exhibit List due by 7/24/2013. Witness List due by 7/24/2013. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/24/2013. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 6/25/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
September 18, 2013 212 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the instant Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth above. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 9/18/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
March 26, 2014 215 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM. An appropriate Order will be entered. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/26/14. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
March 26, 2014 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: For the reasons explained in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court denies New Hampshire's first motion for partial summary judgment, 86 ; grants in part (as to establishing the fact that the insurance policy at issue does not require Blackjack to repair or replace the damaged property) and denies in part (as to all other issues) Blackjack Cove's motion for partial summary judgment, 88 ; grants in part (as to Blackjack's claim for damages stemming from New Hampshire&# 039;s alleged failure to "total" docks at the marina) and denies in part (as to all other issues) New Hampshire's second motion for partial summary judgment, 133 ; and denies New Hampshire's motion to strike, 139 . It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 3/26/14. (tmw)
July 23, 2014 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court having been advised by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Within this sixty-day period, the parties may submit a proposed agreed order of compromise and dismissal. Signed by District Judge Kevin H. Sharp on 7/23/14. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Hampshire Insurance Co. v. Blackjack Cove, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Hampshire Insurance Co.
Represented By: G. Ray Bratton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackjack Cove, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce Union Bank
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]