Jungman v. CSX Transportation, Inc.

Plaintiff: Richard Jungman
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00140
Filed: February 17, 2011
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management. Discovery is not stayed absent order of the District Judge. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 2/17/11. (dt)
March 1, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell recused. Case reassigned to District Judge William J. Haynes, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 3/1/11. (dt)
March 2, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Joe Brown recused. The Clerk is directed to assign this case to another Magistrate Judge for such activities shall be required at the Magistrate Judge level. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe Brown on 3/2/11. (dt)
March 8, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: When this case was transferred to this District on 2/17/2011, it was assigned to Chief Judge Campbell and Magistrate Judge Brown. By orders entered 3/1/2011, and 3/3/2011 15 and 16 , Chief Judge Campbell and Magistrate Judge Brown recused t hemselves, and the case was reassigned to Judge Haynes and the undersigned Magistrate Judge. Inasmuch as Judge Haynes normally conducts his own case management, unless otherwise directed by the Court, there will be no further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge in this case. Judge Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Juliet E. Griffin on 3/8/11. (dt)
March 15, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/4/2011 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant. The parties shall file a proposed case management order 3 business days prior to 4/4/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 3/15/11. (dt)
April 29, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2012. Jury Trial set for 9/11/2012 09:00 AM before District Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2012 03:00 PM before District Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 4/29/11. (dt)
January 18, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 1/18/11. 1/18/11 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/17/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Tennessee Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jungman v. CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Jungman
Represented By: Pamela Rymer O'Dwyer
Represented By: Raymond P. Forceno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Gareth S. Aden
Represented By: Mary Taylor Gallagher
Represented By: Heather Gamache
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]