Aguirre et al v. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. et al

Defendant: Mitsubishi Motor Corporation and Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lizbeth Aguirre and Jorge Aguirre
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00225
Filed: March 11, 2011
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Presiding Judge: Aleta A. Trauger
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2012 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: A stipulation of dismissal or other settlement document shall be filed by close of business on Friday, December 21, 2012. The jury trial set for December 4, 2012 and the pretrial conference set for November 30, 2012 are CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 11/26/12. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
May 26, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 3/20/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2012. Joint Mediation Report due by 5/1/2012. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/26/11. (dt)
September 28, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/28/2012. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)
October 17, 2012 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/17/2012. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Aguirre et al v. Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motor Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi Motors North America, Inc.
Represented By: John Randolph Bibb, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan N. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizbeth Aguirre
Represented By: Blair Pierson Durham
Represented By: David Michael Andrews
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Aguirre
Represented By: David Michael Andrews
Represented By: Blair Pierson Durham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]