North Port Firefighters' Pension-Local Option Plan v. Fushi Copperweld, Inc. et al

Defendant: Fushi Copperweld, Inc., Li Fu, Joseph J. Longever, Craig H. Studwell, Wenbing Christopher Wang and Beihong Linda Zhang
Movant: City of Lakeland Employees Pension Plan and Fushi Copperweld Investor Group
Plaintiff: North Port Firefighters' Pension-Local Option Plan
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00595
Filed: June 20, 2011
 
Court: Tennessee Middle District Court
Office: Nashville Office
County: Davidson
Referring Judge: John S. Bryant
Presiding Judge: William J. Haynes
 
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 110 Featured Case MEMORANDUM and ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum filed herewith, the Defendants motion to dismiss 68 is DENIED. Counsel for the parties have twenty (20) days to file an case management order. It is so ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 3/7/13. (Attachments: # 1 Text Searchable Memorandum and Order)(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(tmw)
May 3, 2013 118 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 2: Jury Trial set for 4/21/2015 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Pretrial Conference set for 4/6/2015 at 3:00 PM before Chief Judge William J. Haynes Jr. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2015. Signed by Chief Judge William J. Haynes, Jr on 5/3/13. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt)
July 22, 2011 20 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT: Within sixty days after the Court's appointment of a lead plaintiff and lead counsel, lead plaintiff shall file a consolidated complaint. The time for Defendants Fushi Cop perweld, Longever, and Studwell to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Summons and Complaint in this action shall be extended up to and including a date 60 days after lead plaintiff'sfiling and service of a consolidated complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 7/22/11. (dt)
August 17, 2011 35 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/17/11. (dt)
August 17, 2011 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge John S. Bryant on 8/17/11. (dt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: North Port Firefighters' Pension-Local Option Plan v. Fushi Copperweld, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fushi Copperweld, Inc.
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: John M. Scannapieco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Fu
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Longever
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: John M. Scannapieco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig H. Studwell
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: John M. Scannapieco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenbing Christopher Wang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beihong Linda Zhang
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: City of Lakeland Employees Pension Plan
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: Timothy L. Miles
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Fushi Copperweld Investor Group
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: Paul Kent Bramlett
Represented By: Robert P. Bramlett
Represented By: Marc I. Gross
Represented By: Jeremy A. Lieberman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Port Firefighters' Pension-Local Option Plan
Represented By: Timothy L. Miles
Represented By: Robert N. Kaplan
Represented By: Douglas S. Johnston, Jr.
Represented By: Pedro A. Herrera
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Campisi
Represented By: George Edward Barrett
Represented By: Danielle S. Myers
Represented By: Darren J. Robbins
Represented By: David A. Rosenfeld
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Represented By: Robert Sugarman
Represented By: David C. Walton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]